LYDICK et al v. NORTH AMERICAN INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC et al
Plaintiff: KARENA LYDICK and JONATHAN LYDICK
Defendant: NORTH AMERICAN INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC and EVERGREEN NORTH AMERICA INDUSTRIAL SERVICES
Case Number: 2:2019cv00468
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EVERGREEN NORTH AMERICA INDUSTRIAL SERVICES. (MCGOUGH, DAVID)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NORTH AMERICAN INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC. (MCGOUGH, DAVID)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/14/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 4/21/2020. Motions due by 5/5/2020. Ready for Trial on 7/6/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to Counsel. Attorney David McGough is admitted to Maine Federal Bar and the requirement for a pro hac vice certification and local counsel can be disregarded. (jwr)
November 26, 2019 Set Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 12/3/2019 from Attorney David W. McGough and to retain local counsel. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (jwr)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID W. MCGOUGH on behalf of EVERGREEN NORTH AMERICA INDUSTRIAL SERVICES (MCGOUGH, DAVID)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by EVERGREEN NORTH AMERICA INDUSTRIAL SERVICES.(MCGOUGH, DAVID) Modified on 11/26/2019 to remove duplicative docket text (jwr).
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID W. MCGOUGH on behalf of NORTH AMERICAN INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC (MCGOUGH, DAVID)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by NORTH AMERICAN INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC.(MCGOUGH, DAVID) Modified on 11/26/2019 to remove duplicative docket text (jwr).
November 19, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for NORTH AMERICAN INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC, EVERGREEN NORTH AMERICA INDUSTRIAL SERVICES : Answer due by 11/26/2019. (jwr)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JONATHAN LYDICK, KARENA LYDICK. NORTH AMERICAN INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC served on 11/5/2019 (MACADAM, JAMES) Modified on 11/19/2019 to include name of defendant served(jwr).
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JONATHAN LYDICK, KARENA LYDICK. NORTH AMERICAN INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC dba EVERGREEN NORTH AMERICAL INDUSTRIAL SERVICES served on 11/5/2019. (MACADAM, JAMES) Modified on 11/19/2019 to include dba(jwr).
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JONATHAN LYDICK, KARENA LYDICK. EVERGREEN NORTH AMERICA INDUSTRIAL SERVICES served on 11/5/2019. (MACADAM, JAMES)
October 17, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2095029.), filed by JONATHAN LYDICK, KARENA LYDICK.(MACADAM, JAMES)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EVERGREEN NORTH AMERICA INDUSTRIAL SERVICES. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued As To NORTH AMERICAN INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC. dba EVERGREEN NORTH, #2 Summons Issues As To NORTH AMERICAN INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.)(mjlt)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mjlt)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EVERGREEN NORTH AMERICA INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, NORTH AMERICAN INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JONATHAN LYDICK, KARENA LYDICK. (Service of Process Deadline 1/13/2020) Fee due by 10/17/2019.(mjlt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LYDICK et al v. NORTH AMERICAN INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARENA LYDICK
Represented By: JAMES J. MACADAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN LYDICK
Represented By: JAMES J. MACADAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH AMERICAN INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC
Represented By: DAVID W. MCGOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERGREEN NORTH AMERICA INDUSTRIAL SERVICES
Represented By: DAVID W. MCGOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?