ANDRADE v. HILL
Appellee: NICOLE NASON HILL
Appellant: ROBERT J ANDRADE, II
Case Number: 2:2019cv00549
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 Supplemental Bankruptcy Certificate of Readiness received. (Attachments: #1 Designation on Appeal, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Notice of Recipients)(jwr)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Excerpted Transcript of US Bankruptcy Court Hearing held on 10/7/2019 before Judge Michael A. Fagone. This transcript is restricted and any request for this transcript should be directed to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court.(jwr)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Appeal Procedural Order Appellant(s) Brief and Appendix due by 2/10/2020. By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Certificate of Readiness received. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Designation on Appeal, #3 Amended Designation on Appeal, #4 Amended Complaint - Virginia, #5 Order - Virginia)(jwr)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT re #1 BANKRUPTCY Appeal (the record on appeal is available at ecf.meb.uscourts.gov) received from U.S. Bankruptcy Court; Bankruptcy Court case number 1802013. (jwr)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY Appeal (the record on appeal is available at ecf.meb.uscourts.gov) received from U.S. Bankruptcy Court; Bankruptcy Court case number 1802013., filed by ROBERT J ANDRADE, II. (Check for Bankruptcy Appeal Certificate of Readiness 1/16/2020.) (Attachments: #1 transmittal form, #2 judgment, #3 memorandum of decision, #4 docket sheet)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANDRADE v. HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NICOLE NASON HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ROBERT J ANDRADE, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?