DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE IN TRUST FOR REGISTERED HOLDERS OF LONG BEACH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005-WL2 ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-WL2 v. MACDONALD et al
Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE IN TRUST FOR REGISTERED HOLDERS OF LONG BEACH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005-WL2 ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-WL2
Defendant: JEANNE MACDONALD and JEANNE IVA MACDONALD
Interested Party: PINE TREE WASTE INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00571
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to PINE TREE WASTE INC on 2/21/2020. (tcs)
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding Set Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to JEANNE MACDONALD Deadline. Deadline was set in error. (tcs)
January 17, 2020 **SET IN ERROR** Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to JEANNE MACDONALD on 2/18/2020. (tcs) Modified on 1/17/2020 to indicate deadline was set in error (tcs).
January 17, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for PINE TREE WASTE INC : Answer due by 1/17/2020. (tcs)
January 17, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE IN TRUST FOR REGISTERED HOLDERS OF LONG BEACH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005-WL2 ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-WL2. PINE TREE WASTE INC served on 12/27/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE IN TRUST FOR REGISTERED HOLDERS OF LONG BEACH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005-WL2 ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-WL2. JEANNE MACDONALD served on 12/26/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) Modified on 1/17/2020 to correct date from 12/27/2019 to 12/26/2019(tcs).
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER to JEANNE MACDONALD from Clerks Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (tcs)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by JEANNE MACDONALD.(tcs)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE IN TRUST FOR REGISTERED HOLDERS OF LONG BEACH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005-WL2 ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-WL2. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
December 20, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2131296.), filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE IN TRUST FOR REGISTERED HOLDERS OF LONG BEACH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005-WL2 ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-WL2.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JEANNE MACDONALD, PINE TREE WASTE INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Pine Tree Waste, Inc summons)(bfa)
December 20, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/27/2019. (bfa)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JEANNE MACDONALD PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE IN TRUST FOR REGISTERED HOLDERS OF LONG BEACH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005-WL2 ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-WL2. (Service of Process Deadline 3/18/2020) Fee due by 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into Deutsche Bank, #5 Exhibit E Assignment into Deutsche Bank, #6 Exhibit G Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2019: #7 Exhibit F - demand letter) (bfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE IN TRUST FOR REGISTERED HOLDERS OF LONG BEACH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005-WL2 ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-WL2 v. MACDONALD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEANNE MACDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEANNE IVA MACDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE IN TRUST FOR REGISTERED HOLDERS OF LONG BEACH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005-WL2 ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-WL2
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PINE TREE WASTE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?