RODRIGUEZ v. MENTOR ABI LLC
Plaintiff: LEXUS RODRIGUEZ
Defendant: MENTOR ABI LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00004
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MENTOR ABI LLC. (HERZOG, PETER)
February 16, 2020 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/24/2020 from MENTOR ABI LLC. (jwr)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/2/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 7/9/2020. Motions due by 7/23/2020. Ready for Trial on 10/5/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (meh)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MENTOR ABI LLC.(WAHRER, WILLIAM)
January 23, 2020 Reset Answer Deadline Per Order #6 : Answer due by 2/13/2020. (meh)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (meh)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by MENTOR ABI LLC Responses due by 2/12/2020. (HERZOG, PETER)
January 14, 2020 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed : Answer due by MENTOR ABI LLC on 1/30/2020. (meh)
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LEXUS RODRIGUEZ. MENTOR ABI LLC served on 1/9/2020. (HANSEN, CHAD)
January 10, 2020 Filing Fee Received from LEXUS RODRIGUEZ: Amount Paid: $400.00. Receipt Number: AMEDC-2139791. Method of Payment: Credit Card. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 1/6/2020 (jwr)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MENTOR ABI LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MENTOR ABI LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by LEXUS RODRIGUEZ. (Service of Process Deadline 4/6/2020) Fee due by 1/8/2020.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RODRIGUEZ v. MENTOR ABI LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENTOR ABI LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM J. WAHRER
Represented By: PETER F. HERZOG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEXUS RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: CHAD T. HANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?