BEROUNSKY v. OCEANSIDE RUBBISH INC
Plaintiff: KYLE BEROUNSKY
Defendant: OCEANSIDE RUBBISH INC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00025
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by OCEANSIDE RUBBISH INC. (FREEMAN, ANN)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by KYLE BEROUNSKY. Reply due by 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BENNETT, JEFFREY)
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OCEANSIDE RUBBISH INC. (FREEMAN, ANN)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by OCEANSIDE RUBBISH INC Responses due by 2/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - US EEOC Dismissal & Notice of Rights, #2 Attachment 2 - MHRC Statement of Finding, #3 Attachment 3 - MDOL Unemployment Decision, #4 Attachment 4 - MHRC Complaint)(FREEMAN, ANN)
January 27, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2155158.), filed by OCEANSIDE RUBBISH INC.(FREEMAN, ANN)
January 27, 2020 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/3/2020. (bfa)
January 27, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for OCEANSIDE RUBBISH INC : Answer due by 1/31/2020. (bfa)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by OCEANSIDE RUBBISH INC. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 notice of filing notice of removal, #3 docket sheet)(bfa)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maine Superior Court, York County, case number ALFSC-CV-2020-006. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by OCEANSIDE RUBBISH INC. (Service of Process Deadline 4/23/2020) Fee due by 1/27/2020.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEROUNSKY v. OCEANSIDE RUBBISH INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYLE BEROUNSKY
Represented By: JEFFREY BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANSIDE RUBBISH INC
Represented By: ANN M. FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?