BAME v. D F RICHARD INC
Plaintiff: CATHERINE BAME
Defendant: D F RICHARD INC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00044
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines per General Order 2020-2 issued by Chief Judge Jon D. Levy on 3/18/2020 : Status Report due by 5/20/2020. (aks)
March 5, 2020 Set Deadlines : Status Report due by 4/20/2020. (akr) Modified on 3/6/2020 to correct date filed (akr).
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay. The Court stays proceedings until further order of the Court. If the parties have not filed a stipulation of dismissal prior to April 20, 2020, the parties shall file a status report by that date. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Settlement by D F RICHARD INC Responses due by 3/26/2020. (BINCZYK, PAWEL)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by PAWEL Z BINCZYK on behalf of D F RICHARD INC (BINCZYK, PAWEL)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL P. JOHNSON on behalf of D F RICHARD INC (JOHNSON, MICHAEL)
February 24, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for D F RICHARD INC : Answer due by 3/10/2020. (akr)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CATHERINE BAME. D F RICHARD INC served on 2/18/2020. (ASEN, TAYLOR)
February 7, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2165186.), filed by CATHERINE BAME.(ASEN, TAYLOR)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to D F RICHARD INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (mnd)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mnd)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D F RICHARD INC filed by CATHERINE BAME. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. Fee due by 2/10/2020. (Service of Process Deadline 5/7/2020) (mnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAME v. D F RICHARD INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D F RICHARD INC
Represented By: PAWEL Z BINCZYK
Represented By: MICHAEL P. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHERINE BAME
Represented By: TAYLOR ANDREW ASEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?