ODEN v. CITY OF WESTBROOK et al
Plaintiff: VINCENT ODEN
Defendant: WESTBROOK POLICE DEPARTMENT, AUSTIN CLARK, JANINE L ROBERTS, CITY OF WESTBROOK, GARRETT MCCARTHY, BENJAMIN HALL, MICHAEL LORANGER and RACHEL HORNING
Case Number: 2:2020cv00081
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for BENJAMIN HALL: Answer due by 5/29/2020. (jgd)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed on Benjamin Hall. (LEE, ADAM)
March 19, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for JANINE L ROBERTS : Answer due by 5/4/2020. (aks)
March 19, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for GARRETT MCCARTHY : Answer due by 5/4/2020. (aks)
March 19, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for MICHAEL LORANGER : Answer due by 5/4/2020. (aks)
March 19, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for RACHEL HORNING : Answer due by 5/4/2020. (aks)
March 19, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for AUSTIN CLARK : Answer due by 5/4/2020. (aks)
March 19, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed on Janine Roberts. (LEE, ADAM)
March 19, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed on Garrett McCarthy. (LEE, ADAM)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed on Michael Loranger. (LEE, ADAM)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed on Rachel Horning. (LEE, ADAM)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed on Austin Clark. (LEE, ADAM)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by CITY OF WESTBROOK, WESTBROOK POLICE DEPARTMENT.(WALL, JOHN)
March 6, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2186303.), filed by WESTBROOK POLICE DEPARTMENT.(WALL, JOHN)
March 6, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for City of Westbrook and Westbrook Police Department : Answer due by 3/16/2020. (bfa)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by CITY OF WESTBROOK, WESTBROOK POLICE DEPARTMENT. (Attachments: #1 docket record, #2 complaint, #3 City of Westbrook summons, #4 Westbrook Police Department summons, #5 motion to enlarge time to answer, #6 order on motion to enlarge time)(bfa)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Androscoggin County Superior Court, case number CV-20-16. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CITY OF WESTBROOK, WESTBROOK POLICE DEPARTMENT. (Service of Process Deadline 6/3/2020) Fee due by 3/9/2020.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ODEN v. CITY OF WESTBROOK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTBROOK POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSTIN CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANINE L ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF WESTBROOK
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARRETT MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL LORANGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RACHEL HORNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT ODEN
Represented By: ADAM R. LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?