FALMOUTH SCHOOL DEPARTMENT v. MR AND MRS DOE
Plaintiff: FALMOUTH SCHOOL DEPARTMENT
Defendant: MR AND MRS DOE
Case Number: 2:2020cv00214
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL W. SEARS on behalf of MR AND MRS DOE (SEARS, RACHEL)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD L. O'MEARA on behalf of MR AND MRS DOE (O'MEARA, RICHARD)
June 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for leave to use aliases; granting #3 Motion for leave to file declaration; granting #3 Motion to Seal. The plaintiff may proceed by using the aliases Mr. and Mrs. Doe in place of the parents' full names; the plaintiff is granted leave to submit under seal its declaration revealing the parents' true names (ECF No. 4); and all other documents of public record in this case which contain the true names of John Doe, and Mr. and Mrs. Doe, shall be sealed, and a redacted version of the same, as appropriate, shall be filed on the record. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
June 19, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2255198.), filed by FALMOUTH SCHOOL DEPARTMENT.(HERLAN, ERIC)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 (Document sealed from public view) SEALED DECLARATION. (bfa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed Under Aliases by FALMOUTH SCHOOL DEPARTMENT (bfa). Added MOTION to Allow Plaintiff to reveal True Names, and MOTION to Seal on 6/19/2020 (nrg).
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MR AND MRS DOE PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FALMOUTH SCHOOL DEPARTMENT. (Service of Process Deadline 9/16/2020) Fee due by 6/22/2020.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FALMOUTH SCHOOL DEPARTMENT v. MR AND MRS DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FALMOUTH SCHOOL DEPARTMENT
Represented By: ERIC R. HERLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR AND MRS DOE
Represented By: RACHEL W. SEARS
Represented By: RICHARD L. O'MEARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?