GALE v. WELLS
Plaintiff: TRACY R GALE
Defendant: ANNE M WELLS
Case Number: 2:2020cv00242
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT By DEPUTY CLERK: Meaghan Hand. (meh)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (meh)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by TRACY R GALE Responses due by 9/4/2020. (MILLER, JACK)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ANNE M WELLS. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (meh)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gerald S. Sack filed by JACK D. MILLER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2272024.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (MILLER, JACK)
July 13, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2271663.), filed by TRACY R GALE.(MILLER, JACK)
July 9, 2020 Set Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 7/16/2020. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (bfa)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANNE M WELLS with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by TRACY R GALE. (Service of Process Deadline 10/7/2020) Fee due by 7/13/2020.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GALE v. WELLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY R GALE
Represented By: JACK D. MILLER
Represented By: GERALD S. SACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNE M WELLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?