NATIONAL PRODUCTS INC v. NORTHE COMPANY LLC
Plaintiff: NATIONAL PRODUCTS INC
Defendant: NORTHE COMPANY LLC doing business as ROAM
Counter Claimant: NORTHE COMPANY LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00261
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Set Deadlines: Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Ryan Tyz must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 9/16/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (tcs)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/27/2021. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 2/3/2021. Motions due by 2/17/2021. Ready for Trial on 4/5/2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (tcs)
September 9, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against NATIONAL PRODUCTS INC by NORTHE COMPANY LLC.(STITHAM, STACY)
September 9, 2020 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NORTHE COMPANY LLC. (STITHAM, STACY)
September 3, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Tyz filed by STACY O. STITHAM on behalf of NORTHE COMPANY LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2308093.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (STITHAM, STACY) Modified on 9/3/2020 to add receipt number (jgd).
September 3, 2020 Set Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement as to NORTHE COMPANY LLC due by 9/10/2020. (tcs)
September 2, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by STACY O. STITHAM on behalf of NORTHE COMPANY LLC (STITHAM, STACY)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Racine's representation of the plaintiff is hereby terminated; the plaintiff continues to be represented by Attorney Klotzle together with associated pro hac vice counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
August 31, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION by Attorney Kristin M. Racine to Withdraw as Attorney for National Products Inc. by NATIONAL PRODUCTS INC Responses due by 9/21/2020. (RACINE, KRISTIN)
August 28, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #15 Notice (Other)/Correspondence: This docket entry was modified to indicate it was filed in error. (jgd)
August 28, 2020 Filing 15 ***Filed in Error***NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: /NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY KRISTIN RACINE by NATIONAL PRODUCTS INC (RACINE, KRISTIN) Modified on 8/28/2020 to indicate filed in error (jgd).
August 19, 2020 Reset Answer Deadline for NORTHE COMPANY LLC per Order at ECF No. 14: Answer due by 9/9/2020. (tcs)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by September 9, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by NATIONAL PRODUCTS INC Responses due by 9/8/2020. (KLOTZLE, REBECCA)
August 3, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for NORTHE COMPANY LLC: Answer due by 8/19/2020. (tcs)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATIONAL PRODUCTS INC. NORTHE COMPANY LLC served on 7/29/2020. (RACINE, KRISTIN)
July 30, 2020 Set Deadlines: Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorneys David K. Tellekson, Jonathan T. McMichael, Jessica M. Kaempf, Jonathan G. Tamimi must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 8/6/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (tcs)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan G. Tamimi filed by REBECCA G. KLOTZLE on behalf of NATIONAL PRODUCTS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2282786.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (KLOTZLE, REBECCA)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jessica M. Kaempf filed by REBECCA G. KLOTZLE on behalf of NATIONAL PRODUCTS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2282783.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (KLOTZLE, REBECCA)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan T. McMichael filed by REBECCA G. KLOTZLE on behalf of NATIONAL PRODUCTS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2282779.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (KLOTZLE, REBECCA)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David K. Tellekson filed by REBECCA G. KLOTZLE on behalf of NATIONAL PRODUCTS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2282750.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (KLOTZLE, REBECCA)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTIN MICHELLE RACINE on behalf of NATIONAL PRODUCTS INC (RACINE, KRISTIN)
July 24, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2279762.), filed by NATIONAL PRODUCTS INC.(KLOTZLE, REBECCA)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #1 Complaint : uploaded incorrect document with the correct document. (bfa)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to NORTHE COMPANY LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (bfa)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NATIONAL PRODUCTS INC. (bfa)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NORTHE COMPANY LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by NATIONAL PRODUCTS INC. (Service of Process Deadline 10/22/2020) Fee due by 7/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent)(bfa) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/24/2020) (bfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL PRODUCTS INC v. NORTHE COMPANY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL PRODUCTS INC
Represented By: KRISTIN MICHELLE RACINE
Represented By: REBECCA G. KLOTZLE
Represented By: JONATHAN G. TAMIMI
Represented By: DAVID K. TELLEKSON
Represented By: JONATHAN THOMAS MCMICHAEL
Represented By: JESSICA M. KAEMPF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHE COMPANY LLC doing business as ROAM
Represented By: RYAN TYZ
Represented By: STACY O. STITHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: NORTHE COMPANY LLC
Represented By: RYAN TYZ
Represented By: STACY O. STITHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?