DEAN v. COMPANION LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: RHONDA DIANE DEAN
Defendant: COMPANION LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv00288
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Reset Answer Deadline for Companion Life Insurance Company : Answer due by 11/4/2020. (tcs)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting without objection #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by November 4, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by COMPANION LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY Responses due by 10/26/2020. (DECKER, BYRNE)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by COMPANION LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (DECKER, BYRNE)
August 26, 2020 Reset Answer Deadline for COMPANION LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY: Answer due by 10/5/2020. (tcs)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting without objection #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by October 5, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
August 25, 2020 Set Deadlines as to COMPANION LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/1/2020. (tcs)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by COMPANION LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY Responses due by 9/15/2020. (DECKER, BYRNE)
August 18, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for COMPANION LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY: Answer due by 9/4/2020. (tcs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to COMPANION LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 8/14/2020. (DAVIS, ANDREW)
August 10, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2291236.), filed by RHONDA DIANE DEAN.(DAVIS, ANDREW)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMPANION LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by RHONDA DIANE DEAN. (Service of Process Deadline 11/9/2020) Fee due by 8/12/2020.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEAN v. COMPANION LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPANION LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BYRNE J. DECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHONDA DIANE DEAN
Represented By: ANDREW S. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?