DOLCE v. GRASSO et al
Plaintiff: TASHA DOLCE
Defendant: KARL GRASSO and ACTION MOVING AND STORAGE AND LOGISTICS LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00297
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting relief requested in #9 Objection to Scheduling Order. The scheduling order is amended to permit the number of depositions requested. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed OBJECTION to #8 Scheduling Order, filed by ACTION MOVING AND STORAGE AND LOGISTICS LLC, KARL GRASSO. Responses due by 9/30/2020. (BUCKSBAUM, ERIN)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/8/2021. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 1/15/2021. Motions due by 1/29/2021. Ready for Trial on 4/5/2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (clp)
August 21, 2020 **FILED IN ERROR**Set Deadlines as to ACTION MOVING AND STORAGE AND LOGISTICS LLC: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/26/2020. (clp) Modified on 8/21/2020 to add FILED IN ERROR notation as this was previously filed as ECF #3(clp).
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by ACTION MOVING AND STORAGE AND LOGISTICS LLC, KARL GRASSO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket Record, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Action Moving Summons & Acknowledgment of Receipt, #4 Exhibit D - Grasso Summons & Acknowledgement of Receipt)(BUCKSBAUM, ERIN)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by ACTION MOVING AND STORAGE AND LOGISTICS LLC, KARL GRASSO.(BUCKSBAUM, ERIN)
August 14, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2295422.), filed by KARL GRASSO, ACTION MOVING AND STORAGE AND LOGISTICS LLC.(BUCKSBAUM, ERIN)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN SHANE BUCKSBAUM on behalf of All Defendants (BUCKSBAUM, ERIN)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 8/21/2020. By DEPUTY CLERK:. (bfa)
August 14, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for KARL GRASSO, ACTION MOVING AND STORAGE AND LOGISTICS LLC : Answer due by 8/21/2020. (bfa)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ACTION MOVING AND STORAGE AND LOGISTICS LLC. (bfa)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-2020-281. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by KARL GRASSO, ACTION MOVING AND STORAGE AND LOGISTICS LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 11/12/2020) Fee due by 8/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - docket sheet, #2 Exhibit B - complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Action Moving & Storage & Logistics, LLC/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Karl Grasso/Acknowledgement of Receipt of Summons and Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - notice of removal, #6 Exhibit F - notice of filing notice of removal)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOLCE v. GRASSO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TASHA DOLCE
Represented By: SEBASTIAN OKUN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARL GRASSO
Represented By: MICHAEL P. JOHNSON
Represented By: ERIN SHANE BUCKSBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTION MOVING AND STORAGE AND LOGISTICS LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL P. JOHNSON
Represented By: ERIN SHANE BUCKSBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?