GAUMOND et al v. FARRINGTON
Plaintiff: PATRICIA A GAUMOND and JONATHAN D MANN
Defendant: CHERYL S FARRINGTON
Case Number: 2:2020cv00300
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIELLA MASSIMILLA on behalf of CHERYL S FARRINGTON (MASSIMILLA, DANIELLA)
September 11, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for CHERYL S FARRINGTON per Waiver of Service Returned Executed: Answer due by 10/20/2020. (lrt)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs as to CHERYL S FARRINGTON. Waiver sent on 8/21/2020 (CHARDON, ALEXIS) Modified on 9/11/2020 to clarify docket text (lrt).
August 27, 2020 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney JOSEPH B. BURNS must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 9/3/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (tcs)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph B. Burns filed by ALEXIS G. CHARDON on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2304059.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (CHARDON, ALEXIS)
August 20, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2299440.), filed by PATRICIA A GAUMOND.(CHARDON, ALEXIS)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CHERYL S FARRINGTON. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHERYL S FARRINGTON PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by PATRICIA A GAUMOND, JONATHAN D MANN. (Service of Process Deadline 11/17/2020) Fee due by 8/21/2020.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GAUMOND et al v. FARRINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA A GAUMOND
Represented By: ALEXIS G. CHARDON
Represented By: JOSEPH B. BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN D MANN
Represented By: ALEXIS G. CHARDON
Represented By: JOSEPH B. BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERYL S FARRINGTON
Represented By: DANIELLA MASSIMILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?