UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $1000 IN US CURRENCY et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $1000 IN US CURRENCY and $4639 IN US CURRENCY
Claimant: Norman Lachance
Case Number: 2:2020cv00307
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Norman Lachance served on 9/10/2020. (CLARK, DONALD)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. $4639 IN US CURRENCY served on 9/11/2020. (CLARK, DONALD)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. $1000 IN US CURRENCY served on 9/11/2020. (CLARK, DONALD)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Norman Lachance served on 9/2/2020. (CLARK, DONALD)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 WARRANT In Rem Issued By DEPUTY CLERK: Lindsey Tully (lrt)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $1000 IN US CURRENCY, $4639 IN US CURRENCY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Service of Process Deadline 11/23/2020)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $1000 IN US CURRENCY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1000 IN US CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4639 IN US CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: DONALD E. CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Norman Lachance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?