US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET INVESTMENT LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-4 v. JANELLE et al
Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET INVESTMENT LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-4
Defendant: DIANE JANELLE, SHANE JANELLE and STEPHEN MONAGHAN
Case Number: 2:2020cv00337
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT filed by DIANE JANELLE. (tcs)
November 17, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT filed by SHANE JANELLE. (tcs)
November 17, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION for Reconsideration re #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed by STEPHEN MONAGHAN. (tcs)
November 12, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Reconsideration re #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, #17 MOTION for Reconsideration re #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET INVESTMENT LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-4. Reply due by 11/27/2020. (LACOMBE, ELIZABETH)
November 10, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT filed by DIANE JANELLE. (tcs)
November 10, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Reconsideration re #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by SHANE JANELLE Responses due by 12/1/2020. (tcs)
November 10, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Reconsideration re #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by STEPHEN MONAGHAN Responses due by 12/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 1 - Common Law Copyright Notice, #2 2 - Hold Harmless and Indemnity Agreement, #3 3 - Security Agreement, #4 4 - Legal Notice and Mandate, #5 Proposed Order re Discharging Action, #6 Proposed Order re Vacating ECF No. 16, #7 Envelope)(tcs)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS denying #6 Motion to Dismiss; denying 11 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
November 4, 2020 RESET Answer Deadlines for STEPHEN MONAGHAN, SHANE JANELLE and DIANE JANELLE : Answers due by 12/1/2020. (tcs)
October 26, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by STEPHEN MONAGHAN. (tcs)
October 26, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DIANE JANELLE. (tcs)
October 26, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SHANE JANELLE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope)(tcs) (Attachment 1 replaced to replace with correct scan on 10/27/2020) (tcs).
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding Set/Reset Deadlines - Please note the check for motion for default deadline has been terminated. The deadline was set in error. (tcs)
October 22, 2020 **SET IN ERROR** Set Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to DIANE JANELLE on 11/23/2020. (tcs) Modified on 10/22/2020 to indicate deadline was set in error (tcs).
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 and 11 MOTIONS to Dismiss filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET INVESTMENT LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-4. Reply due by 10/30/2020. (LACOMBE, ELIZABETH) Modified on 10/22/2020 to link response to ECF NO. 11 at request of counsel (tcs).
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET INVESTMENT LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-4. STEPHEN MONAGHAN served on 10/2/2020. (LACOMBE, ELIZABETH)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET INVESTMENT LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-4. SHANE JANELLE served on 9/30/2020. (LACOMBE, ELIZABETH)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET INVESTMENT LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-4. DIANE JANELLE served on 9/30/2020. (LACOMBE, ELIZABETH)
October 16, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for STEPHEN MONAGHAN per Affidavit of Service: Answer due by 10/23/2020. (lrt)
October 16, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for DIANE JANELLE and SHANE JANELLE per Affidavits of Service: Answers due by 10/21/2020. (lrt)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss (NO PDF ATTACHED, See ECF No. [6-1]). by STEPHEN MONAGHAN Responses due by 11/5/2020. (tcs)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by SHANE JANELLE and DIANE JANELLE Responses due by 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Dilatory Petition to the Complaint by Stephen Monaghan, #2 Exhibit A - Commencement of Foreclosure by Civil Action, #3 Exhibit B - Note, #4 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #5 Exhibit D - Assignment of Mortgage, #6 Exhibit E - Application to Surrender of Authority to do Business, #7 Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service, #9 Envelope)(tcs) Modified on 10/22/2020 to correct filers (tcs).
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH M. LACOMBE on behalf of US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET INVESTMENT LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-4 (LACOMBE, ELIZABETH)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DIANE JANELLE, SHANE JANELLE, STEPHEN MONAGHAN. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Shane Janelle summons, #2 Stephen Monaghan summons)(bfa)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET INVESTMENT LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-4. (MESSINGER, BRETT)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DIANE JANELLE, SHANE JANELLE, STEPHEN MONAGHAN PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET INVESTMENT LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-4. (Service of Process Deadline 12/22/2020) Fee due by 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Quitclaim Assignment, #4 Exhibit D - Foreclosure Judgment, #5 Exhibit E - Notice to Cease and Desist #1, #6 Exhibit F - Notice to Cease and Desist #2, #7 Exhibit G - Notice to Cease and Desist #3, #8 Exhibit H - Waiver of Foreclosure, #9 Exhibit I - Discharge of Mortgage, #10 Exhibit J - Administrative Declaratory Judgment)(bfa)
September 23, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2323622.), filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET INVESTMENT LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-4.(MESSINGER, BRETT)
September 23, 2020 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/30/2020. (bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET INVESTMENT LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-4 v. JANELLE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE JANELLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANE JANELLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN MONAGHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET INVESTMENT LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-4
Represented By: BRETT L. MESSINGER
Represented By: ELIZABETH M. LACOMBE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?