FAZELI, MD et al v. NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER LODGE II LLC et al
Plaintiff: JABBAR FAZELI, MD and MAINE GERIATRICS LLC
Defendant: ORLENE DEMATTEO, KATRIN FEICK, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA STROUDWATER II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA WELLS II LLC, AVITA WELLS LLC doing business as AVITA OF WELLS, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER LODGE II LLC, AVITA STROUDWATER LLC doing business as AVITA OF STROUDWATER, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER ASSISTED LIVING LLC doing business as STROUDWATER LODGE and NORTHBRIDGE COMPANIES
Case Number: 2:2020cv00350
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JABBAR FAZELI, MD, MAINE GERIATRICS LLC. (HANSEN, CHAD)
November 19, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #14 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #13 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #15 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #16 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement, : These entries have been marked filed in error. A corrected statement has been filed at ECF #17. (aks)
November 19, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendants by AVITA STROUDWATER LLC, AVITA WELLS LLC, ORLENE DEMATTEO, KATRIN FEICK, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA STROUDWATER II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA WELLS II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE COMPANIES, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER ASSISTED LIVING LLC, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER LODGE II LLC. (SCOTT, K.)
November 16, 2020 Filing 16 ***FILED IN ERROR*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendant Avita Stroudwater II LLC by AVITA STROUDWATER LLC, AVITA WELLS LLC, ORLENE DEMATTEO, KATRIN FEICK, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA STROUDWATER II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA WELLS II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE COMPANIES, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER ASSISTED LIVING LLC, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER LODGE II LLC. (SCOTT, K.) Modified on 11/19/2020 (aks).
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 ***FILED IN ERROR*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendant Northbridge Stroudwater Assisted Living LLC by AVITA STROUDWATER LLC, AVITA WELLS LLC, ORLENE DEMATTEO, KATRIN FEICK, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA STROUDWATER II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA WELLS II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE COMPANIES, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER ASSISTED LIVING LLC, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER LODGE II LLC. (SCOTT, K.) Modified on 11/19/2020 (aks).
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 ***FILED IN ERROR*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendant Northbridge Stroudwater Lodge II LLC by AVITA STROUDWATER LLC, AVITA WELLS LLC, ORLENE DEMATTEO, KATRIN FEICK, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA STROUDWATER II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA WELLS II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE COMPANIES, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER ASSISTED LIVING LLC, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER LODGE II LLC. (SCOTT, K.) Modified on 11/19/2020 (aks).
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 ***FILED IN ERROR*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendant Avita Stroudwater II LLC by AVITA STROUDWATER LLC, AVITA WELLS LLC, ORLENE DEMATTEO, KATRIN FEICK, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA STROUDWATER II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA WELLS II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE COMPANIES, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER ASSISTED LIVING LLC, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER LODGE II LLC. (SCOTT, K.) Modified on 11/19/2020 (aks).
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 ***FILED IN ERROR*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendant Northbridge Avita Wells II LLC by AVITA STROUDWATER LLC, AVITA WELLS LLC, ORLENE DEMATTEO, KATRIN FEICK, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA STROUDWATER II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA WELLS II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE COMPANIES, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER ASSISTED LIVING LLC, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER LODGE II LLC. (SCOTT, K.) Modified on 11/19/2020 (aks).
November 16, 2020 Filing 11 ***FILED IN ERROR*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendant Northbridge Stroudwater Lodge II, LLC by AVITA STROUDWATER LLC, AVITA WELLS LLC, ORLENE DEMATTEO, KATRIN FEICK, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA STROUDWATER II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA WELLS II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE COMPANIES, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER ASSISTED LIVING LLC, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER LODGE II LLC. (SCOTT, K.) Modified on 11/19/2020 (aks).
November 16, 2020 Filing 10 ***FILED IN ERROR*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendant Northbridge Companies by AVITA STROUDWATER LLC, AVITA WELLS LLC, ORLENE DEMATTEO, KATRIN FEICK, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA STROUDWATER II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA WELLS II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE COMPANIES, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER ASSISTED LIVING LLC, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER LODGE II LLC. (SCOTT, K.) Modified on 11/19/2020 (aks).
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 ***FILED IN ERROR*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendant Avita Wells, LLC by AVITA STROUDWATER LLC, AVITA WELLS LLC, ORLENE DEMATTEO, KATRIN FEICK, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA STROUDWATER II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA WELLS II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE COMPANIES, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER ASSISTED LIVING LLC, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER LODGE II LLC. (SCOTT, K.) Modified on 11/19/2020 (aks).
November 10, 2020 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/17/2020. (aks)
November 6, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by AVITA STROUDWATER LLC, AVITA WELLS LLC, ORLENE DEMATTEO, KATRIN FEICK, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA STROUDWATER II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA WELLS II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE COMPANIES, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER ASSISTED LIVING LLC, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER LODGE II LLC in support of #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bangor Daily News Article)(SCOTT, K.) Modified on 11/6/2020 to remove duplicative text (aks).
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AVITA STROUDWATER LLC, AVITA WELLS LLC, ORLENE DEMATTEO, KATRIN FEICK, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA STROUDWATER II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA WELLS II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE COMPANIES, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER ASSISTED LIVING LLC, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER LODGE II LLC Responses due by 11/27/2020. (SCOTT, K.)
October 8, 2020 Reset Answer Deadline for All Defendants : Answer due by 11/6/2020. (aks)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting without objection #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendants shall file their answers to the plaintiffs' complaint by November 6, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by JABBAR FAZELI, MD, MAINE GERIATRICS LLC Responses due by 10/29/2020. (HANSEN, CHAD)
October 6, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for All Defendants : Answer due by 10/27/2020. (aks)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAINE GERIATRICS LLC, JABBAR FAZELI, MD. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Avita Wells, LLC, #2 Summons - Orlene Dematteo, #3 Summons - Katrin Feick, #4 Summons - Northbridge Avita Stroudwater II, LLC, #5 Summons - Northbridge Avita Wells II, LLC, #6 Summons - Northbridge Companies, #7 Summons - Northbridge Stroudwater Assisted Living, LLC, #8 Summons - Northbridge Stroudwater Lodge II, LLC)(HANSEN, CHAD)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AVITA STROUDWATER LLC, AVITA WELLS LLC, ORLENE DEMATTEO, KATRIN FEICK, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA STROUDWATER II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA WELLS II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE COMPANIES, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER ASSISTED LIVING LLC, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER LODGE II LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Avita Wells, LLC summons, #2 Orlene Dematteo summons, #3 Katrin Feick summons, #4 Northbridge Avita Stroudwater II, LLC summons, #5 Northbridge Avita Wells II, LLC summons, #6 Northbridge Companies summons, #7 Northbridge Stroudwater Assisted Living, LLC, #8 Northbridge Stroudwater Lodge II, LLC summons)(bfa)
September 28, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2327660.), filed by MAINE GERIATRICS LLC, JABBAR FAZELI, MD.(HANSEN, CHAD)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AVITA STROUDWATER LLC, AVITA WELLS LLC, ORLENE DEMATTEO, KATRIN FEICK, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA STROUDWATER II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE AVITA WELLS II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER ASSISTED LIVING LLC, NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER LODGE II LLC, NORTHBRIDGE COMPANIES with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by MAINE GERIATRICS LLC, JABBAR FAZELI, MD. (Service of Process Deadline 12/28/2020) Fee due by 9/30/2020.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FAZELI, MD et al v. NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER LODGE II LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORLENE DEMATTEO
Represented By: K. JOSHUA SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATRIN FEICK
Represented By: K. JOSHUA SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHBRIDGE AVITA STROUDWATER II LLC
Represented By: K. JOSHUA SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHBRIDGE AVITA WELLS II LLC
Represented By: K. JOSHUA SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVITA WELLS LLC doing business as AVITA OF WELLS
Represented By: K. JOSHUA SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER LODGE II LLC
Represented By: K. JOSHUA SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVITA STROUDWATER LLC doing business as AVITA OF STROUDWATER
Represented By: K. JOSHUA SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHBRIDGE STROUDWATER ASSISTED LIVING LLC doing business as STROUDWATER LODGE
Represented By: K. JOSHUA SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHBRIDGE COMPANIES
Represented By: K. JOSHUA SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JABBAR FAZELI, MD
Represented By: CHAD T. HANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAINE GERIATRICS LLC
Represented By: CHAD T. HANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?