JOHNSON-TOOTHAKER et al v. BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC et al
Plaintiff: MARCINA JOHNSON-TOOTHAKER and MEGAN GRAY
Defendant: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION and BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00371
Filed: October 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (SCHAEFER, ANDREW)
November 23, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by MEGAN GRAY, MARCINA JOHNSON-TOOTHAKER. Reply due by 12/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decision and Order)(METCALF, JUDY)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Because the Plaintiffs agree that the Amended Complaint should be dismissed solely as to Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation (PHH), see ECF Nos. 11, 12, PHH's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (ECF No. 7) is GRANTED, and the Amended Complaint is DISMISSED solely as to PHH. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting #14 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/17/2021. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 5/24/2021. Motions due by 6/14/2021. Ready for Trial on 8/9/2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by MEGAN GRAY, MARCINA JOHNSON-TOOTHAKER Responses due by 12/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Amended Scheduling Order)(METCALF, JUDY)
November 9, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION Responses due by 11/30/2020. (SCHAEFER, ANDREW)
November 4, 2020 Filing 12 Amended RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by MEGAN GRAY, MARCINA JOHNSON-TOOTHAKER. Reply due by 11/18/2020. (METCALF, JUDY) Modified on 11/4/2020 to add "Amended" (aks).
November 3, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by MEGAN GRAY, MARCINA JOHNSON-TOOTHAKER. Reply due by 11/17/2020. (METCALF, JUDY)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/17/2021. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 3/24/2021. Motions due by 4/7/2021. Ready for Trial on 6/7/2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties by BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (SCHAEFER, ANDREW)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (LACOMBE, ELIZABETH)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION Responses due by 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Massachusetts Secretary of State printout, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Quitclaim Assignment)(LACOMBE, ELIZABETH)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket Record, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Executed Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit E - Motion to Enlarge Time, #6 Exhibit F - Order on Motion to Enlarge Time, #7 Exhibit G - Answer and Affirmative Defenses for Federal National Mortgage Association, #8 Exhibit H - Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #9 Exhibit I - Motion to Amend Complaint, #10 Exhibit J - Objection to Motion to Amend and Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #11 Exhibit K - Entry of Appearance for Federal National Mortgage Association, #12 Exhibit L - Order on Motion to Amend Complaint and Motion to Dismiss, #13 Exhibit M - Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Bayview Loan Servicing, #14 Exhibit N - Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Federal National Mortgage Association, #15 Exhibit O - Entry of Appearance for PHH Mortgage Corporation, #16 Exhibit P - Acceptance of Service for PHH Mortgage Corporation, #17 Exhibit Q - Scheduling Order, #18 Exhibit R - Motion for Extension of Time to Plead)(LACOMBE, ELIZABETH)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #4 Notice (Other)/Correspondence : This entry has been marked "Filed in Error" and is to be re-filed at the request of the Clerk's Office. (aks)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: filing of Exhibit A State Court record referenced in Notice of Removal by PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION (LACOMBE, ELIZABETH) Modified on 10/13/2020 (aks).
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 10/20/2020. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
October 13, 2020 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/20/2020. (bfa)
October 13, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION : Answer due by 10/19/2020. (bfa)
October 13, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2339752.), filed by PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION.(MESSINGER, BRETT)
October 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number PORSC-RE-2020-00047. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (Service of Process Deadline 1/11/2021) Fee due by 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 notice of filing notice of removal)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON-TOOTHAKER et al v. BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCINA JOHNSON-TOOTHAKER
Represented By: JUDY METCALF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEGAN GRAY
Represented By: JUDY METCALF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: ANDREW J. SCHAEFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Represented By: BRETT L. MESSINGER
Represented By: ELIZABETH M. LACOMBE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC
Represented By: ANDREW J. SCHAEFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?