AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE FOUNDATION v. US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Plaintiff: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE FOUNDATION
Defendant: US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Case Number: 2:2020cv00422
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
2 Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to January 11, 2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
December 15, 2020 Reset Answer Deadline for US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES: Answer due by 1/11/2021. (tcs)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES Responses due by 1/4/2021. (EILER, ASHLEY)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY E. EILER on behalf of US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (EILER, ASHLEY)
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE FOUNDATION. US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 11/19/2020. (BOND, EMMA) Modified on 12/15/2020 to correct date from 11/24/2020 to 11/19/2020(tcs).
December 1, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES: Answer due by 1/25/2021. (tcs)
December 1, 2020 Set Deadlines: Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney JULIA BROWN must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 12/8/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (tcs)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (tcs)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III recused. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (slg)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE FOUNDATION. (Service of Process Deadline 2/10/2021) Fee due by 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USCIS Boston and Newark FOIA, #2 Exhibit B - USCIS FOIA initial response, #3 Exhibit C - FOIA appeal, #4 Exhibit D - USCIS decision on Admin appeal, #5 Exhibit E - email to FOIA Ombudsman redacted, #6 Exhibit F - receipt of request to FOIA Ombudsman, #7 Exhibit G - USCIS FOIA PA check status)(bfa)
November 12, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2365880.), filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE FOUNDATION.(BOND, EMMA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE FOUNDATION v. US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: ASHLEY E. EILER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE FOUNDATION
Represented By: ANNA WELCH
Represented By: JULIA BROWN
Represented By: EMMA EATON BOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?