MR AND MS DOE v. PORTLAND PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Plaintiff: MR AND MS DOE
Defendant: PORTLAND PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Case Number: 2:2020cv00461
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed PORTLAND PUBLIC SCHOOLS waiver sent on 12/17/2020. (O'MEARA, RICHARD)
December 29, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for PORTLAND PUBLIC SCHOOLS : Answer due by 2/16/2021. (aks)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Proceed Under Aliases and to Seal Certain Documents. Plaintiffs may proceed by using the aliases as requested; the declaration filed by Plaintiffs (ECF No. 4) shall be sealed; all other documents of public record which contain the Plaintiffs' names shall be sealed and a redacted version of the documents shall be filed on the record. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to PORTLAND PUBLIC SCHOOLS. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
December 10, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2389957.), filed by MR AND MS DOE.(O'MEARA, RICHARD)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO PROCEED UNDER ALIASES AND TO SEAL CERTAIN DOCUMENTS by MR AND MS DOE (bfa)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PORTLAND PUBLIC SCHOOLS with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by MR AND MS DOE. (Service of Process Deadline 3/9/2021) Fee due by 12/11/2020.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MR AND MS DOE v. PORTLAND PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MR AND MS DOE
Represented By: RICHARD L. O'MEARA
Represented By: SEAN R. TURLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTLAND PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?