PETERS v. POWER & ENERGY SYSTEMS INC
Plaintiff: LONNIE PETERS
Defendant: POWER & ENERGY SYSTEMS INC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00473
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorneys Andrew W. Dunlap & Carl A. Fitz must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 2/19/2021. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (mnd)
February 4, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Dunlap filed by JEFFREY NEIL YOUNG on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2436347.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (YOUNG, JEFFREY)
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Carl Fitz filed by JEFFREY NEIL YOUNG on behalf of LONNIE PETERS (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2436346.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (YOUNG, JEFFREY)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting without objection #5 Motion to Stay. No pretrial deadline having yet been set, the court construes the parties' joint motion as a motion to enlarge the deadline for defendant's response to the plaintiff's complaint. So construed, the motion is granted without objection, and the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's complaint by April 2, 2021. The parties shall file a joint written status report, as proposed, by March 5, 2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
February 3, 2021 Reset Answer Deadline for POWER & ENERGY SYSTEMS INC - Per Order #6: Answer deadline reset to 4/2/2021. (mnd)
February 3, 2021 Set Deadlines - Per Order #6: Status Report due by 3/5/2021. (mnd)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings & Deadlines by POWER & ENERGY SYSTEMS INC Responses due by 2/22/2021. (WALKER, TARA)
January 21, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for POWER & ENERGY SYSTEMS INC - Per Summons Returned Executed #4: Answer due by 2/1/2021. (mnd)
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned Executed. POWER & ENERGY SYSTEMS INC served on 1/11/2021. (YOUNG, JEFFREY) Modified on 1/21/2021 to clean up text (mnd).
December 24, 2020 Filing Fee Received from LONNIE PETERS: Amount Paid: $402.00. Receipt Number: internet payment. Method of Payment: Credit Card. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 12/23/2020 (jwr)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to POWER & ENERGY SYSTEMS INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against POWER & ENERGY SYSTEMS INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by LONNIE PETERS. (Service of Process Deadline 3/22/2021) Fee due by 12/23/2020.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PETERS v. POWER & ENERGY SYSTEMS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POWER & ENERGY SYSTEMS INC
Represented By: TARA A. WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONNIE PETERS
Represented By: JEFFREY NEIL YOUNG
Represented By: ANDREW DUNLAP
Represented By: CARL A. FITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?