IMMIGRANT LEGAL ADVOCACY PROJECT et al v. US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SCHOOL OF LAW REFUGEE AND HUMAN RIGHTS CLINIC, IMMIGRANT LEGAL ADVOCACY PROJECT and AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE FOUNDATION
Defendant: US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Case Number: 2:2021cv00066
Filed: March 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROCEDURAL ORDER. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
April 16, 2021 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Telephone Conference held. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Melissa Merenberg) (MFS)
April 16, 2021 Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/12/2021. (MFS)
April 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 4/16/2021 at 11:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. The parties have been provided with the Court's call-in information. (MFS)
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, by US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(EILER, ASHLEY)
March 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY E. EILER on behalf of US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (EILER, ASHLEY)
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by IMMIGRANT LEGAL ADVOCACY PROJECT, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE FOUNDATION. US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 3/8/2021. (BOND, EMMA)
March 15, 2021 Set Deadlines: Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney PHILIP MANTIS must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 3/22/2021. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (tcs)
March 15, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT: Answer due by 5/7/2021. (tcs)
March 4, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (tcs)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, filed by IMMIGRANT LEGAL ADVOCACY PROJECT, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE FOUNDATION. (Service of Process Deadline 6/2/2021) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, #2 Exhibit B - Jan. 15, 2021 Email, #3 Exhibit C - ICE Webpage, #4 Exhibit D - Feb. 21, 2021 Email)(BOND, EMMA)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
March 3, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
March 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SCHOOL OF LAW REFUGEE AND HUMAN RIGHTS CLINIC, IMMIGRANT LEGAL ADVOCACY PROJECT, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE FOUNDATION. (Service of Process Deadline 6/1/2021) Fee due by 3/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1/15/21 ICE FOIA, #2 Exhibit B - 2/12/21 FOIA request, #3 Exhibit C - ICE Webpage, #4 Exhibit D - 2/22/21 email)(bfa)
March 3, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2456578.), filed by UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SCHOOL OF LAW REFUGEE AND HUMAN RIGHTS CLINIC, IMMIGRANT LEGAL ADVOCACY PROJECT, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE FOUNDATION.(BOND, EMMA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IMMIGRANT LEGAL ADVOCACY PROJECT et al v. US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SCHOOL OF LAW REFUGEE AND HUMAN RIGHTS CLINIC
Represented By: ANNA WELCH
Represented By: JULIA BROWN
Represented By: PHILIP MANTIS
Represented By: EMMA EATON BOND
Represented By: PHILIP THIERRY MANTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IMMIGRANT LEGAL ADVOCACY PROJECT
Represented By: ANNA WELCH
Represented By: JULIA BROWN
Represented By: PHILIP MANTIS
Represented By: EMMA EATON BOND
Represented By: PHILIP THIERRY MANTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE FOUNDATION
Represented By: ANNA WELCH
Represented By: JULIA BROWN
Represented By: PHILIP MANTIS
Represented By: EMMA EATON BOND
Represented By: PHILIP THIERRY MANTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: ASHLEY E. EILER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?