CHADBOURNE v. LONGSTAFF et al
Plaintiff: HERB CHADBOURNE
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5, BRIAN LONGSTAFF and MUNICIPALITY OF SCARBOROUGH MAINE
Case Number: 2:2021cv00085
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER mooting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
April 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by HERB CHADBOURNE (slg)
April 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by HERB CHADBOURNE (slg)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - reserving ruling on #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnd)
April 13, 2021 Set Deadlines - Per Order #7: Completed form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due by 4/27/2021. (mnd)
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by HERB CHADBOURNE (Attachments: #1 Financial Affidavit)(mnd)
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by HERB CHADBOURNE re #1 Complaint. Main Document: Exhibit 5. (Attachments: #1 Index to Exhibits)(mnd)
April 13, 2021 Reset Deadlines : Pro Se Appearance Form due from Herb Chadbourne by 4/27/2021. (mnd)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING FILING FEE - Set Deadlines: Fee or Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due by 4/14/2021. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnd)
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from the Clerk's Office to HERB CHADBOURNE providing Information for Pro Se Parties Handout. (mnd)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by HERB CHADBOURNE. No PDF document is attached to this docket entry. The Motion for Preliminary Injunction is included within ECF No. 1. To view PDF document, see ECF No. 1. (mnd)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BRIAN LONGSTAFF, MUNICIPALITY OF SCARBOROUGH MAINE and JOHN DOES 1-5 filed by HERB CHADBOURNE. Service of Process Deadline 6/28/2021. Fee due by 3/31/2021. (Note: No Exhibit 5 received) PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Attachments: #1 Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Two Intelius.com Summaries, #3 Exhibit 2 - Criminal Record Summary, #4 Exhibit 3 - Letter to Phil Saucier, Esq. dated 10/25/2020, #5 Exhibit 4 - Game Camera Photo, #6 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Code Enforcement Inspection, #7 Exhibit 7 - Response to Phil Saucier, Esq., #8 Exhibit 8 - Freedom of Access Act Request, #9 Game Camera Photo of Canadian Lynx, #10 Envelope)(mnd)
March 29, 2021 Set Deadlines : Pro Se Appearance Form due from Herb Chadbourne by 4/12/2021. (mnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHADBOURNE v. LONGSTAFF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN LONGSTAFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUNICIPALITY OF SCARBOROUGH MAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERB CHADBOURNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?