COVETRUS INC et al v. ACTIAN CORPORATION
Plaintiff: VETERINARY DATA SERVICES INC and COVETRUS INC
Defendant: ACTIAN CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2021cv00097
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/14/2021. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 10/21/2021. Motions due by 11/4/2021. Ready for Trial on 1/3/2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (slg) Modified on 5/28/2021 to correct motions and SJ deadlines (slg).
May 28, 2021 Set Scheduling Order Deadlines per Order #15 : Motions due by 11/4/2021. (slg)
May 28, 2021 Set Scheduling Order Deadlines - per Order #15: Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 10/21/2021. (slg)
May 27, 2021 Filing 14 Actian Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by ACTIAN CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - License Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - 2019 Sales Order, #3 Exhibit C - 2019 Support Policy, #4 Exhibit D - 2015 Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Actian Copyright Registrations)(TAYLOR, ADAM) Modified on 5/27/2021 to clean up docket text (meh).
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting without objection #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiffs' complaint by May 28, 2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
April 30, 2021 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney RYAN E HATCH must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 5/6/2021. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (meh)
April 30, 2021 Reset Answer Deadline for ACTIAN CORPORATION per ECF Order #13: Answer due by 5/28/2021. (meh)
April 29, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by H. ILSE TEETERS-TRUMPY on behalf of ACTIAN CORPORATION (TEETERS-TRUMPY, H.)
April 29, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan E. Hatch, Esq. filed by ADAM S. TAYLOR on behalf of ACTIAN CORPORATION (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2484560.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (TAYLOR, ADAM)
April 29, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by ACTIAN CORPORATION Responses due by 5/20/2021. (TAYLOR, ADAM)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM S. TAYLOR on behalf of ACTIAN CORPORATION (TAYLOR, ADAM)
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Danielle J. Healey filed by PAUL MCDONALD on behalf of COVETRUS INC, VETERINARY DATA SERVICES INC The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (MCDONALD, PAUL)
April 15, 2021 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney DANIELLE J. HEALEY must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 4/22/2021. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (aks)
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 **FILED IN ERROR** CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Danielle J. Healey filed by PAUL MCDONALD on behalf of COVETRUS INC, VETERINARY DATA SERVICES INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2478199.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (MCDONALD, PAUL) Modified on 4/15/2021 to indicate as filed in error. Counsel to refile due to mistake on certificate (meh).
April 9, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COVETRUS INC, VETERINARY DATA SERVICES INC. ACTIAN CORPORATION served on 4/9/2021. (MCDONALD, PAUL)
April 9, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for ACTIAN CORPORATION : Answer due by 4/30/2021. (meh)
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ACTIAN CORPORATION. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (meh)
April 6, 2021 Filing 4 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; copy e-mailed to U.S Copyright Office. (bfa)
April 6, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by COVETRUS INC, VETERINARY DATA SERVICES INC. (bfa)
April 6, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACTIAN CORPORATION PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by COVETRUS INC, VETERINARY DATA SERVICES INC. (Service of Process Deadline 7/6/2021) Fee due by 4/8/2021.(bfa)
April 6, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2474006.), filed by COVETRUS INC, VETERINARY DATA SERVICES INC.(MCDONALD, PAUL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COVETRUS INC et al v. ACTIAN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VETERINARY DATA SERVICES INC
Represented By: PAUL MCDONALD
Represented By: DANIELLE J. HEALEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COVETRUS INC
Represented By: PAUL MCDONALD
Represented By: DANIELLE J. HEALEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTIAN CORPORATION
Represented By: RYAN E. HATCH
Represented By: H. ILSE TEETERS-TRUMPY
Represented By: ADAM S. TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?