KNOWLES v. PONTE et al
Plaintiff: MICHELLE KNOWLES
Defendant: HEATHER E CHARRON, GUY W TINKHAM, EDWARD O'CONNOR and JOSEPH PONTE
Case Number: 2:2021cv00108
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by HEATHER E CHARRON, EDWARD O'CONNOR, JOSEPH PONTE Responses due by 6/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy 10.2 Suicide Prevention Procedure)(O'BRIEN, JILLIAN)
May 24, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHELLE KNOWLES. JOSEPH PONTE served on 4/26/2021. (MORGAN, MATTHEW)
May 24, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHELLE KNOWLES. EDWARD O'CONNOR served on 4/26/2021. (MORGAN, MATTHEW)
May 10, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for JOSEPH PONTE per Order No. 11: Answer due by 6/7/2021. (lrt)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting without objection #10 Motion to Extend Time. Defendant Ponte shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by June 7, 2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by JOSEPH PONTE Responses due by 5/28/2021. (O'BRIEN, JILLIAN)
May 3, 2021 Reset Answer Deadline for EDWARD O'CONNOR and HEATHER E CHARRON per Order No. 9: Answers due by 6/7/2021. (lrt)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting without objection #8 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants Charron and O'Connor shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by June 7, 2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time To Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint through June 7, 2021 by HEATHER E CHARRON, EDWARD O'CONNOR Responses due by 5/24/2021. (O'BRIEN, JILLIAN)
April 28, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for HEATHER E CHARRON per Summons Returned Executed (ECF No. 7): Answer due by 5/10/2021. (lrt)
April 28, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHELLE KNOWLES. HEATHER E CHARRON served on 4/17/2021. (MORGAN, MATTHEW)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 Redacted Summons to H. Charron by HEATHER E CHARRON. (O'BRIEN, JILLIAN) Modified on 4/26/2021 to clarify docket text (lrt).
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting without objection #4 Sealed Motion to Seal. For the reasons set forth in Defendant Heather Charron's motion, ECF Nos. 3-3 and 4 shall remain sealed until further order of the court. Upon entry of this order, Defendant Charron's counsel shall file forthwith, as a separate, public filing on the court's docket, the redacted copy of the summons, ECF No. 4-1. Further, plaintiff's counsel is directed to redact Defendant Charron's home address at the time of filing her return of service. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 (Document sealed from public view) Unopposed SEALED MOTION by HEATHER E CHARRON Responses due by 5/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Summons For Public Filing)(O'BRIEN, JILLIAN)
April 14, 2021 Filing Fee Received from MICHELLE KNOWLES: Amount Paid: $402.00. Receipt Number: AMEDC-2477875. Method of Payment: Credit Card. Purpose of Payment: Civil Case Opening Filing Fee. Date Paid: 04/14/2021. (mnd)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HEATHER E CHARRON, EDWARD O'CONNOR, JOSEPH PONTE, GUY W TINKHAM. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Edward O'Connor summons, #2 Guy Tinkham summons, #3 Heather Charron summons)(bfa) Modified on 4/19/2021 to temporarily seal summons in anticipation of a motion to seal (tcs).
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HEATHER E CHARRON, EDWARD O'CONNOR, JOSEPH PONTE, GUY W TINKHAM with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by MICHELLE KNOWLES. (Service of Process Deadline 7/12/2021) Fee due by 4/15/2021.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KNOWLES v. PONTE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE KNOWLES
Represented By: WALTER F. MCKEE
Represented By: MATTHEW D. MORGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER E CHARRON
Represented By: JILLIAN R. O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUY W TINKHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD O'CONNOR
Represented By: JILLIAN R. O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH PONTE
Represented By: JILLIAN R. O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?