FROST v. CASTLE POINT MORTGAGE INC et al
Plaintiff: KEVIN B. FROST
Defendant: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC, CASTLE POINT MORTGAGE INC, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, PHH MORTGAGE SERVICES and FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Interested Party: MIDLAND FUNDING
Case Number: 2:2021cv00112
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC, PHH MORTGAGE SERVICES. (MESSINGER, BRETT)
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by KEVIN B. FROST. Reply due by 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.1 - Acknowledgement of Correspondence, #2 Exhibit A.2 - Letter to Kevin B. Frost from Brett L. Messinger dated April 8, 2021, #3 Exhibit B - Early Intervention - Borrower Assistance, #4 Exhibit C - Letter from Carrie Folsom, Esq. to Castle Point Mortgage Inc dated November 17, 2016 with attached Quitclaim Assignment, #5 Envelope)(mnd)
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by KEVIN B. FROST. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(mnd)
April 26, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC, PHH MORTGAGE SERVICES Responses due by 5/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Certificate of Service)(MESSINGER, BRETT)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC. (LACOMBE, ELIZABETH) Modified on 4/23/2021 to clean up docket text (slg).
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (LACOMBE, ELIZABETH) Modified on 4/23/2021 to clean up docket text (slg).
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PHH MORTGAGE SERVICES. (LACOMBE, ELIZABETH) Modified on 4/23/2021 to clean up docket text (slg).
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC. (LACOMBE, ELIZABETH) Modified on 4/23/2021 to clean up docket text(slg).
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by BRETT L. MESSINGER on behalf of FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC, PHH MORTGAGE SERVICES (MESSINGER, BRETT)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from the Clerk's Office to KEVIN B. FROST providing information for pro se parties handout. (mnd)
April 21, 2021 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC & PHH MORTGAGE SERVICES by 4/28/2021. (mnd)
April 21, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC & PHH MORTGAGE SERVICES : Answers due by 4/27/2021. (mnd)
April 21, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2481060.), filed by MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC, PHH MORTGAGE SERVICES, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION.(LACOMBE, ELIZABETH)
April 21, 2021 Set Deadlines : Pro Se Appearance Form due from KEVIN B. FROST by 5/5/2021. (mnd)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mnd)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from South Paris District Court, Case Number SOPDC-RE-21-00006 filed by MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC & PHH MORTGAGE SERVICES. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 7/19/2021) Fee due by 4/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record including Docket Record and Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service)(mnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FROST v. CASTLE POINT MORTGAGE INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC
Represented By: ELIZABETH M. LACOMBE
Represented By: BRETT L. MESSINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASTLE POINT MORTGAGE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC
Represented By: ELIZABETH M. LACOMBE
Represented By: BRETT L. MESSINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH MORTGAGE SERVICES
Represented By: ELIZABETH M. LACOMBE
Represented By: BRETT L. MESSINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: ELIZABETH M. LACOMBE
Represented By: BRETT L. MESSINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN B. FROST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MIDLAND FUNDING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?