VIOLETTE v. PHAROS HOUSE et al
Plaintiff: GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE
Defendant: KIM HARTLEY, PHAROS HOUSE DIRECTOR, PHAROS HOUSE and US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 2:2021cv00148
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(clp)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines per notification of change of address: Pro Se Appearance Form due on 6/29/2021. (clp)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER from Clerks Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (bfa)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines : Pro Se Appearance Form due on 6/18/2021. (bfa)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE (bfa)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KIM HARTLEY, PHAROS HOUSE, PHAROS HOUSE DIRECTOR, US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE with Jury Demand, filed by GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE. (Service of Process Deadline 9/2/2021) (Attachments: #1 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VIOLETTE v. PHAROS HOUSE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM HARTLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHAROS HOUSE DIRECTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHAROS HOUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?