RUSSELL v. CHENEVERT
Plaintiff: JULIA RUSSELL
Defendant: PHILLIP AUGUSTUS CHENEVERT, II
Case Number: 2:2021cv00191
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JULIA RUSSELL. PHILLIP AUGUSTUS CHENEVERT, II served on 7/10/2021. (ASEN, TAYLOR) Modified on 9/1/2021 to correct date from 7/25/21 to 7/10/21 (tcs).
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Pending Resolution of the Motion to Stay. If the Court grants Defendant's Motion to Stay, Defendant's answer to the complaint shall be due 14 days after the stay is lifted. If the Court denies the motion, Defendant's answer shall be due 14 days after the order on the Motion to Stay issues. SO ORDERED. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (tcs)
August 18, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer Pending Resolution of Motion to Stay filed by JULIA RUSSELL. Reply due by 9/1/2021. (ASEN, TAYLOR)
August 17, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer Pending Resolution of Motion to Stay by PHILLIP AUGUSTUS CHENEVERT, II Responses due by 9/7/2021. (SMITH, TYLER)
August 17, 2021 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay filed by PHILLIP AUGUSTUS CHENEVERT, II. (SMITH, TYLER)
August 6, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Stay filed by JULIA RUSSELL. Reply due by 8/20/2021. (ASEN, TAYLOR)
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay by PHILLIP AUGUSTUS CHENEVERT, II Responses due by 8/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Portland Press Herald Article)(SMITH, TYLER)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by GENE R. LIBBY on behalf of PHILLIP AUGUSTUS CHENEVERT, II (LIBBY, GENE)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting without objection #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by August 30, 2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
July 23, 2021 Reset Answer Deadline for PHILLIP AUGUSTUS CHENEVERT, II : Answer due by 8/30/2021. (tcs)
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by PHILLIP AUGUSTUS CHENEVERT, II Responses due by 8/12/2021. (SMITH, TYLER)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by TYLER J. SMITH on behalf of PHILLIP AUGUSTUS CHENEVERT, II (SMITH, TYLER)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PHILLIP AUGUSTUS CHENEVERT, II. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (clp)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (clp)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHILLIP AUGUSTUS CHENEVERT, II with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. filed by JULIA RUSSELL. (Service of Process Deadline 10/7/2021) Fee due by 7/12/2021.(clp)
July 9, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2519065.), filed by JULIA RUSSELL.(ASEN, TAYLOR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUSSELL v. CHENEVERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIA RUSSELL
Represented By: TAYLOR ANDREW ASEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP AUGUSTUS CHENEVERT, II
Represented By: GENE R. LIBBY
Represented By: TYLER J. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?