COHEN v. CITY OF PORTLAND et al
Plaintiff: JOHN COHEN
Defendant: CITY OF PORTLAND, SERGEANT CHRISTOPHER GERVAIS, MICHAEL RAND, JOHN DOE and RONALD GIROUX
Case Number: 2:2021cv00267
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by SARA P. CRESSEY on behalf of CITY OF PORTLAND, CHRISTOPHER GERVAIS, MICHAEL RAND (CRESSEY, SARA)
October 27, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by KASIA S. PARK on behalf of CITY OF PORTLAND, CHRISTOPHER GERVAIS, MICHAEL RAND (PARK, KASIA)
October 27, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD R. BENJAMIN, JR on behalf of CITY OF PORTLAND, CHRISTOPHER GERVAIS, MICHAEL RAND (BENJAMIN, EDWARD)
October 20, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed CHRISTOPHER GERVAIS waiver sent on 10/8/2021. (PARADIE, VERNE) Modified on 10/20/2021- to correct date waiver sent to be 10/8/2021 (mnd).
October 20, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed CITY OF PORTLAND waiver sent on 10/8/2021. (PARADIE, VERNE) Modified on 10/20/2021 to correct date waiver sent to be 10/8/2021 (mnd).
October 20, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed MICHAEL RAND waiver sent on 10/8/2021. (PARADIE, VERNE) Modified on 10/20/2021 to correct date waiver sent to be 10/8/2021 (mnd).
October 20, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for CHRISTOPHER GERVAIS - Per Wavier of Service Executed #12: Answer due by 12/7/2021. (mnd)
October 20, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for CITY OF PORTLAND - Per Waiver of Service Executed #11: Answer due by 12/7/2021. (mnd)
October 20, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for MICHAEL RAND - Per Waiver of Service Executed #10: Answer due by 12/7/2021. (mnd)
October 4, 2021 Filing 9 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against CITY OF PORTLAND, JOHN DOE, CHRISTOPHER GERVAIS, MICHAEL RAND, filed by JOHN COHEN. (Service of Process Deadline 1/3/2022)(PARADIE, VERNE)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend. REMINDER: After entry of this Order, counsel for the plaintiff shall separately file the SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT document, ECF No. 7-1, as a separate filing on the court's docket forthwith. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 Second MOTION to Amend #4 Amended Complaint by JOHN COHEN Responses due by 10/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Amended Complaint)(PARADIE, VERNE)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Amend. The Amended Complaint has been filed by the plaintiff at ECF No. 4. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by JOHN COHEN Responses due by 10/7/2021. (PARADIE, VERNE) Modified on 9/16/2021 to clean up text (slg).
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CITY OF PORTLAND, JOHN DOE, CHRISTOPHER GERVAIS, MICHAEL RAND, filed by JOHN COHEN. (Service of Process Deadline 12/15/2021)(PARADIE, VERNE)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CITY OF PORTLAND, JOHN DOE, CHRISTOPHER GERVAIS, MICHAEL RAND. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 City of Portland summons, #2 Michael Rand summons, #3 John Doe summons)(bfa)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF PORTLAND, JOHN DOE, CHRISTOPHER GERVAIS, MICHAEL RAND with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JOHN COHEN. (Service of Process Deadline 12/14/2021) Fee due by 9/17/2021.(bfa)
September 15, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2548775.), filed by JOHN COHEN.(PARADIE, VERNE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COHEN v. CITY OF PORTLAND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN COHEN
Represented By: VERNE E. PARADIE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PORTLAND
Represented By: EDWARD R. BENJAMIN, JR.
Represented By: KASIA S. PARK
Represented By: SARA P. CRESSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT CHRISTOPHER GERVAIS
Represented By: EDWARD R. BENJAMIN, JR.
Represented By: KASIA S. PARK
Represented By: SARA P. CRESSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL RAND
Represented By: EDWARD R. BENJAMIN, JR.
Represented By: KASIA S. PARK
Represented By: SARA P. CRESSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD GIROUX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?