BANTA v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Plaintiff: JAEDON ROBERT BANTA
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2021cv00270
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by LOUIS J. GEORGE on behalf of SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER (GEORGE, LOUIS)
October 1, 2021 Filing 8 Certified Mail Service Returned by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION on 9/23/2021 as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. (mmy)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 Certified Mail Service Returned by Attorney General on 9/27/21 as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. (jwr)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 Certified Mail Service Returned as to US Attorney on 9/21/21 as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. (mlm)
September 22, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER: Answer due by 11/22/2021. (mlm)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Attorney General summons, #2 U.S. Attorney summons)(bfa) .
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR SERVICE: The Clerk will prepare the required summons(es) for service by certified mail on the federal agency(ies). By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (bfa)
September 20, 2021 Summons completed and mailed via certified mail return receipt along with a copy of the Complaint. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. A PDF DOCUMENT IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY. (bfa)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAEDON ROBERT BANTA (bfa)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER, filed by JAEDON ROBERT BANTA. (Service of Process Deadline 12/16/2021) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - letter from SSA granting extension of time to file a civil action, #2 Exhibit 2 - notice of appeals council action)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BANTA v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAEDON ROBERT BANTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Represented By: LOUIS J. GEORGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?