FEDEQ DV004 LLC et al v. CITY OF PORTLAND
Plaintiff: FEDEQ DV004 LLC, FEDEQ DV005 LLC, FEDEQ SPONSOR ENTITY V LLC and REDWOOD DEVELOPMENT CONSULTING LLC
Defendant: CITY OF PORTLAND
Case Number: 2:2021cv00327
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CITY OF PORTLAND. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (lrt)
November 19, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2580716.), filed by FEDEQ DV004 LLC, REDWOOD DEVELOPMENT CONSULTING LLC, FEDEQ SPONSOR ENTITY V LLC, FEDEQ DV005 LLC.(SMITH, TYLER)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF PORTLAND with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FEDEQ DV004 LLC, REDWOOD DEVELOPMENT CONSULTING LLC, FEDEQ SPONSOR ENTITY V LLC, FEDEQ DV005 LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 2/16/2022) Fee due by 11/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Midtown Recorded Subdivision Plan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deed to Lot 6, #3 Exhibit 3 - Condemnation Order)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDEQ DV004 LLC et al v. CITY OF PORTLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDEQ DV004 LLC
Represented By: GENE R. LIBBY
Represented By: KEITH P. RICHARD
Represented By: TYLER J. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDEQ DV005 LLC
Represented By: GENE R. LIBBY
Represented By: KEITH P. RICHARD
Represented By: TYLER J. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDEQ SPONSOR ENTITY V LLC
Represented By: GENE R. LIBBY
Represented By: KEITH P. RICHARD
Represented By: TYLER J. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REDWOOD DEVELOPMENT CONSULTING LLC
Represented By: GENE R. LIBBY
Represented By: KEITH P. RICHARD
Represented By: TYLER J. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PORTLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?