CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC v. ROGERS
Plaintiff: CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC
Defendant: ROBERT H ROGERS, JR
Interested Party: SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES and MARY H ROGERS
Case Number: 2:2022cv00032
Filed: February 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC. MAINE REVENUE SERVICES served on 2/10/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
February 22, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by MAINE REVENUE SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Priority Position)(CROSMAN, KEVIN)
February 11, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
February 11, 2022 Filing 5 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC. SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT served on 2/7/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) Modified on 2/11/2022 to indicate document was filed in error. Counsel to refile at request of Clerk's Office (mmy).
February 11, 2022 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Affidavit of Service for SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT: Answer due by 4/8/2022. (mmy)
February 4, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
February 4, 2022 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2612505.), filed by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
February 3, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, MARY H ROGERS, ROBERT H ROGERS, JR, SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Secretary of Housing and Urban Development summons, #2 Maine Revenue Services summons, #3 Mary H Rogers summons)(bfa)
February 3, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
February 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERT H ROGERS, JR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 5/4/2022) Fee due by 2/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into Bank of America, #5 Exhibit E Assignment into Carrington, #6 Exhibit F - Quitclaim Assignment into Carrington, #7 Exhibit G Loan Modification, #8 Exhibit H - Demand, #9 Exhibit I Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)
February 3, 2022 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/10/2022. (bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC v. ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT H ROGERS, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MAINE REVENUE SERVICES
Represented By: KEVIN J. CROSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MARY H ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?