FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION v. JOHNSON et al
Defendant: JAMES A JOHNSON
Counter Defendant: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Cross Claimant: MARY JOHNSON
Interested Party: KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION and KEVIN GAGNON
Case Number: 2:2022cv00148
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #14 Motion to Dismiss: Responses due by 8/4/2022. (mlm)
July 14, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss-Rule12(b)(6) WITH CROSSCLAIM against JAMES A JOHNSON, and WITH COUNTERCLAIM against FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION by MARY JOHNSON.(VAN HOUTEN, THOMAS) Modified on 7/15/2022 to clarify text (mlm).
June 28, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE: Recently JAMES A JOHNSON filed a pleading in this Court without representation of an attorney. Information regarding representing yourself is available on the Court's website at #https://www.med.uscourts.gov/handout-self-represented-parties including a Handout for Self-Represented Parties. This handout is intended for informational and practical purposes only and in no way takes the place of an attorney's legal advice, but it may provide some answers to procedural and general questions. ALSO NOTE: You are responsible for notifying the Court in writing of any changes to your mailing address or telephone number and of any change in status regarding representation by an attorney. (cc: pro se litigant) (jgd)
June 27, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Vacate Void Proceeding by JAMES A JOHNSON. Responses due by 7/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jgd)
June 23, 2022 Reset Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 7/25/2022 as to KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, JAMES A JOHNSON and KEVIN GAGNON. (jwr)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to July 14, 2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
June 16, 2022 Reset Answer Deadline for MARY JOHNSON: Answer due by 7/14/2022. (mmy)
June 15, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to JAMES A JOHNSON and KEVIN GAGNON on 7/15/2022. (mmy)
June 14, 2022 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by MARY JOHNSON Responses due by 7/5/2022. (VAN HOUTEN, THOMAS)
June 14, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION. KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION served on 5/31/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 14, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION. KEVIN GAGNON served on 5/24/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 14, 2022 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Affidavit of Service for KEVIN GAGNON: Answer due by 6/14/2022. (mmy)
June 14, 2022 Set Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to JAMES A JOHNSON on 7/14/2022. (mmy)
June 14, 2022 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed for KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION: Answer due by 6/21/2022. (mmy)
May 31, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION. MARY JOHNSON served on 5/24/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION. JAMES A JOHNSON served on 5/23/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
May 31, 2022 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed for MARY JOHNSON: Answer due by 6/14/2022. (mmy)
May 31, 2022 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed for JAMES A JOHNSON: Answer due by 6/13/2022. (mmy)
May 19, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
May 19, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to KEVIN GAGNON, KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Key Bank National Association summons)(bfa)
May 19, 2022 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2654427.), filed by FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
May 18, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JAMES A JOHNSON, MARY JOHNSON. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Mary Johnson SUMMONS)(bfa)
May 18, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JAMES A JOHNSON, MARY JOHNSON PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (Service of Process Deadline 8/16/2022) Fee due by 5/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, #5 Exhibit E Assignment into Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., #6 Exhibit F Quitclaim Assignment into Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., #7 Exhibit G Assignment into Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, #8 Exhibit H Demand Package, #9 Exhibit I Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)
May 18, 2022 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/25/2022. (bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION v. JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Represented By: LAUREN THOMAS
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: MARY JOHNSON
Represented By: THOMAS G. VAN HOUTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES A JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: KEVIN GAGNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?