ISMAIL et al v. ROBINSON et al
Plaintiff: AHMED ISMAIL
Defendant: PHILLIP ROBINSON and OFFICER WRIGLEY
Not Classified By Court: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Case Number: 2:2022cv00150
Filed: May 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address as to AHMED ISMAIL per ECF No. 14 - Address changed from York County Jail, 1 Layman Way, Alfred, ME 04002 to Cumberland County Jail, 50 County Way, Portland, ME 04102 (tcs)
July 5, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Subsequent Mailing to Plaintiff of ECF No. 12 and ECF No. 13 by PHILLIP ROBINSON (Attachments: #1 Copy of Returned Envelope)(PATWARDHAN, KIMBERLY)
June 22, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Attested Exhibit, ECF No. 12-4 by PHILLIP ROBINSON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attested copy of Motion to Suppress, ECF 12-4)(PATWARDHAN, KIMBERLY)
June 16, 2022 Filing 12 OBJECTION to #10 Scheduling Order and Motion to Stay filed by PHILLIP ROBINSON. Responses due by 7/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Indictment, #3 Exhibit Docket Record, #4 Exhibit Motion to Suppress)(PATWARDHAN, KIMBERLY)
June 6, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Answer filed by AHMED ISMAIL re #8 Answer to Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(tcs)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/13/2022. Motions due by 11/3/2022. Ready for Trial on 1/3/2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Main Document 10 replaced on 5/27/2022 to include deputy clerk /s/ ) (lrt).
May 26, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by PHILLIP ROBINSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Def Robinson Acknowledgment of Service)(PATWARDHAN, KIMBERLY)
May 25, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by WRIGLEY.(WALL, JOHN)
May 20, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by KIMBERLY L. PATWARDHAN on behalf of PHILLIP ROBINSON (PATWARDHAN, KIMBERLY)
May 20, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANTS: You are responsible for notifying the Court in writing of any changes to your mailing address or telephone number and of any change in status regarding representation by an attorney. cc: pro se litigant (bfa)
May 20, 2022 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by WRIGLEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Attested Docket Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Application of Pl to Proceed wo Payment of Fees & Order Granting, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pl's Mot for Clerk to Serve Defs & Order Granting)(WALL, JOHN)
May 20, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Set/Reset Answer Deadline : entries referenced incorrect party. (bfa)
May 20, 2022 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 5/27/2022. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
May 20, 2022 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2655023.), filed by WRIGLEY.(WALL, JOHN)
May 20, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for OFFICER WRIGLEY : Answer due by 5/26/2022. (bfa)
May 20, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for PHILLIP ROBINSON : Answer due by 5/26/2022. (bfa) Modified on 5/20/2022. This deadline has been terminated. It was set for the incorrect filer. (bfa).
May 19, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
May 19, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number PORSC-CV-2021-00468. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by OFFICER WRIGLEY. (Service of Process Deadline 8/17/2022) Fee due by 5/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 complaint)(bfa) Modified on 5/20/2022 to correct filer(bfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ISMAIL et al v. ROBINSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMED ISMAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP ROBINSON
Represented By: KIMBERLY L. PATWARDHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER WRIGLEY
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?