US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. COUSINS et al
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Defendant: WARREN G COUSINS, JR and KRISTI COUSINS
Interested Party: LVNV FUNDING LLC, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION and HELEN COUSINS
Case Number: 2:2022cv00323
Filed: October 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Referring Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
2 Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Set Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to KRISTI COUSINS, WARREN G COUSINS, JR, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION and LVNV FUNDING LLC on 1/13/2023. (tcs)
November 17, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. LVNV FUNDING LLC served on 11/9/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) Modified on 11/17/2022 to correct date served from 10/26/2022 to 11/9/2022 (tcs).
November 17, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. KRISTI COUSINS served on 11/3/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
November 17, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. WARREN G COUSINS, JR served on 11/3/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
November 17, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for KRISTI COUSINS and WARREN G COUSINS, JR: Answers due by 11/25/2022. (tcs)
November 17, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for LVNV FUNDING LLC: Answer due by 11/30/2022. (tcs)
November 7, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION: Answer due by 11/23/2022. (tcs)
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION served on 11/2/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
October 25, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
October 25, 2022 Case Randomly Reassigned to JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL no longer assigned to the case as improperly assigned at case opening. (jwr)
October 24, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HELEN COUSINS, KRISTI COUSINS, WARREN G COUSINS, JR, LVNV FUNDING LLC, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons for Kristi Cousins, #2 Summons for LVNV Funding LLC, #3 Summons for US Bank National Association, #4 Summons for Helen Cousins)(jwr)
October 24, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
October 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION against HELEN COUSINS, KRISTI COUSINS, WARREN G COUSINS, JR, LVNV FUNDING LLC, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS.. (Service of Process Deadline 1/23/2023) Fee due by 10/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Loan Agreement, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., #5 Exhibit E Assignment into Citibank, N.A. as Trustee for CMLTI asset Trust, #6 Exhibit F Assignment into Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust 2019-E, #7 Exhibit G- Assignment into US Bank Trust National Association, not in its individual capacity, bur solely as trustee of Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust 2019-E, #8 Exhibit H Demand Package, #9 Exhibit I - Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(jwr)
October 24, 2022 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2716194.), filed by US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
October 24, 2022 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/31/2022 from Plaintiff. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. COUSINS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN G COUSINS, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTI COUSINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LVNV FUNDING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HELEN COUSINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?