COLLAGAN v. CUMBERLAND COUNTY JAIL et al
Plaintiff: LESLIE COLLAGAN
Defendant: CUMBERLAND COUNTY JAIL, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, SHERIFF JOYCE, CHIEF GAGNON, MAJOR KORTES, CAPTAIN COSTELLO, JON DOE 1-5, JANE DOE 1-5 and CAPTAIN GOULET
Case Number: 2:2022cv00328
Filed: October 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 1/12/2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER terminating #5 Order to Show Cause. The record reflects the Order to Show Cause was returned to the Court as undeliverable. Plaintiff is also a plaintiff in the case of Collagan v. Aroostook County Jail, et al., No. 1:22-cv-00362-JAW. The docket in the Aroostook County case lists a different, evidently more current, address for Plaintiff. The Court will issue a new Order to Show Cause. The clerk shall send the order to Plaintiff at the Aroostook County address and shall change Plaintiff's address to the Aroostook County address on the docket in this case. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MAIL (ECF No. 5) sent to LESLIE COLLAGAN returned as undeliverable. Reason: Insufficient Address, Unable to Forward. (tcs)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/12/2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING FILING FEE. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines: Filing Fee or Application to Proceed Without Prepayment due by 11/17/2022. (MFS)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by LESLIE COLLAGAN (tcs)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAPTAIN COSTELLO, CAPTAIN GOULET, CHIEF GAGNON, CUMBERLAND COUNTY JAIL, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, JANE DOE 1-5, JON DOE 1-5, MAJOR KORTES, SHERIFF JOYCE PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by LESLIE COLLAGAN. (Service of Process Deadline 1/23/2023) Fee due by 10/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Letter dated October 16, 2022, #2 Letter in Support of Complaint, #3 Envelope)(tcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLLAGAN v. CUMBERLAND COUNTY JAIL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLIE COLLAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMBERLAND COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF JOYCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIEF GAGNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJOR KORTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN COSTELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JON DOE 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN GOULET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?