US BANK NA v. COZZONE, et al
Plaintiff: US BANK NA
Defendant: JOAN C COZZONE and MICHAEL M COZZONE, JR
Interested Party: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, RELIANT LOAN SERVICING LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK NA, FIA CARD SERVICES NA and DISCOVER BANK
Case Number: 2:2022cv00357
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to DISCOVER BANK, RELIANT LOAN SERVICING LLC, FIA CARD SERVICES NA, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, and WELLS FARGO BANK NA as no answer or responsive pleadings were filed: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 2/13/2023. (clp)
January 11, 2023 Set Deadlines as to DISCOVER BANK, FIA CARD SERVICES NA, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, and WELLS FARGO BANK NA as no answer or responsive pleading was filed: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 2/10/2023. (clp)
January 10, 2023 Set Deadlines as to FIA CARD SERVICES NA as no answer or responsive pleading was filed: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 2/9/2023. (clp)
January 5, 2023 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by US BANK NA. WELLS FARGO BANK NA served on 12/20/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
January 5, 2023 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by US BANK NA. FIA CARD SERVICES NA served on 12/19/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
January 5, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by US BANK NA. MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC served on 12/20/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
January 5, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by US BANK NA. DISCOVER BANK served on 12/20/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
January 5, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by US BANK NA. RELIANT LOAN SERVICING LLC served on 12/22/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
January 5, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC in accordance with ECF No. 9 Affidavit of Service filed served 12/20/2022: Answer due by 1/10/2023. (clp)
January 5, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for WELLS FARGO BANK NA in accordance with ECF No. 11 Affidavit of Service Filed served 12/20/2022: Answer due by 1/10/2023. (clp)
January 5, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for FIA CARD SERVICES NA in accordance with ECF No. 10 Affidavit of Service Filed served 12/19/2022: Answer due by 1/9/2023. (clp)
January 5, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for DISCOVER BANK in accordance with ECF no. 8 Affidavit of Service Filed Served 12/20/2022: Answer due by 1/10/2023. (clp)
January 5, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for RELIANT LOAN SERVICING LLC in accordance with ECF No. 7 Affidavit of Service Filed served 12/22/2022: Answer due by 1/12/2023. (clp)
December 28, 2022 Set Deadlines as to JOAN C COZZONE and MICHAEL M COZZONE, JR as no answer or responsive pleading was filed: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 1/27/2023. (clp)
December 15, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK NA. JOAN C COZZONE served on 12/5/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
December 15, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK NA. MICHAEL M COZZONE, JR served on 12/3/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
December 15, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for JOAN C COZZONE: Answer due by 12/27/2022. (tcs)
December 15, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for MICHAEL M COZZONE, JR: Answer due by 12/27/2022. (tcs)
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK NA. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JOAN C COZZONE, MICHAEL M COZZONE, JR, DISCOVER BANK, FIA CARD SERVICES NA, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, RELIANT LOAN SERVICING LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK NA. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons-Joan Cozzone, #2 Summons-MERS, #3 Summons-Reliant Loan Servicing LLC, #4 Summons-Wells Fargo Bank NA, #5 Summons-FIA Card Services NA, #6 Summons-Discover Bank)(clp)
November 15, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (clp)
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK NA. (Service of Process Deadline 2/13/2023) Fee due by 11/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B-Note, #3 Exhibit C-Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D-Assignment of Mortgage, #5 Exhibit E-Corrective Assignment into US Bank NA, #6 Exhibit F-Orders, #7 Exhibit G-Quitclaim Assignment into US Bank NA, #8 Exhibit H-Demand Letter, #9 Exhibit I-Affidavit Relating to Military Search, #10 Exhibit J-Affidavit of City of Sanford, #11 Exhibit K-Findings and Order)(clp)
November 15, 2022 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2725339.), filed by US BANK NA.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
November 15, 2022 Set Deadlines as to US BANK NA: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/25/2022. (clp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US BANK NA v. COZZONE, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US BANK NA
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOAN C COZZONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL M COZZONE, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: RELIANT LOAN SERVICING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FIA CARD SERVICES NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DISCOVER BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?