WOODS v. ALLEGIS GROUP INC et al
Plaintiff: JAMAURA WOODS
Defendant: ALLEGIS GROUP INC, ALLEGIS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS INC, AEROTEK INC and ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00389
Filed: December 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Referring Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 05/22/2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN)
May 15, 2023 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer [BY ALL DEFENDANTS] filed by ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC Responses due by 6/5/2023. (PARDO, CHRISTOPHER)
May 15, 2023 Reset Answer Deadline for ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC, AEROTEK INC, ALLEGIS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS INC, and ALLEGIS GROUP INC: Answer due by 5/22/2023. (mmy)
May 4, 2023 Reset Answer Deadline for AEROTEK INC, ALLEGIS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS INC, ALLEGIS GROUP INC per Order #16: Answer due by 5/15/2023. (mmy)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Allegis Group, Inc., Allegis Global Solutions, Inc., and Aerotek, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 05/15/2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN)
May 2, 2023 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by AEROTEK INC, ALLEGIS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS INC, ALLEGIS GROUP INC Responses due by 5/23/2023. (ISRAEL, GLENN)
May 2, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by GLENN ISRAEL on behalf of AEROTEK INC, ALLEGIS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS INC, ALLEGIS GROUP INC (ISRAEL, GLENN)
April 18, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #7 Waiver of Service Executed, #6 Waiver of Service Executed, #8 Waiver of Service Executed: These docket entries were modified to correct the date the waivers were sent to 2/13/2023. (mmy)
April 18, 2023 Set Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to AEROTEK INC, ALLEGIS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS INC, ALLEGIS GROUP INC on 5/18/2023. (mmy)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mmy)
April 14, 2023 Reset Answer Deadline per Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC: Answer due by 5/15/2023. (mmy)
April 13, 2023 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC Responses due by 5/4/2023. (PARDO, CHRISTOPHER)
April 13, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER M. PARDO on behalf of ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC (PARDO, CHRISTOPHER)
March 30, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC waiver sent on 2/13/2023. (QUINLAN, DANIELLE)
March 30, 2023 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Waiver of Service Executed for ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC: Answer due by 4/14/2023. (mmy)
March 17, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ALLEGIS GROUP INC waiver sent on 2/13/2023. (QUINLAN, DANIELLE) Modified on 4/18/2023 to correct date waiver was sent (mmy).
March 17, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ALLEGIS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS INC waiver sent on 2/13/2023. (QUINLAN, DANIELLE) Modified on 4/18/2023 to correct date waiver was sent (mmy).
March 17, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed AEROTEK INC waiver sent on 2/13/2023. (QUINLAN, DANIELLE) Modified on 4/18/2023 to correct date waiver was sent (mmy).
March 17, 2023 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Waivers of Service Executed for AEROTEK INC, ALLEGIS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS INC, ALLEGIS GROUP INC: Answers due by 4/14/2023. (mmy)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Extend Time 30 Days to Complete Service By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (mmy)
March 7, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Extend Time 30 days to complete service by JAMAURA WOODS Responses due by 3/28/2023. (QUINLAN, DANIELLE)
March 7, 2023 Reset Deadlines per Order #5: Service of Process Deadline 4/6/2023 (mmy)
February 3, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC, AEROTEK INC, ALLEGIS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS INC, ALLEGIS GROUP INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Allegis Global Solutions, Inc., #2 Summons - Aerotek, Inc., #3 Summons - Abbott Laboratories, Inc.) (mmy)
December 12, 2022 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2735740.), filed by JAMAURA WOODS.(QUINLAN, DANIELLE)
December 8, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
December 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by JAMAURA WOODS against ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC, AEROTEK INC, ALLEGIS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS INC, ALLEGIS GROUP INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS.. (Service of Process Deadline 3/8/2023) Fee due by 12/12/2022.(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOODS v. ALLEGIS GROUP INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMAURA WOODS
Represented By: DANIELLE M. QUINLAN
Represented By: LAURA H. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGIS GROUP INC
Represented By: GLENN ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGIS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS INC
Represented By: GLENN ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEROTEK INC
Represented By: GLENN ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. PARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?