STATE MANUFACTURED HOMES INC v. CITY OF SOUTH PORTLAND et al
Plaintiff: STATE MANUFACTURED HOMES INC
Defendant: CITY OF SOUTH PORTLAND and TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH
Case Number: 2:2023cv00019
Filed: January 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2023 Filing 21 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to March 31, 2023 to file Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Reply to Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by STATE MANUFACTURED HOMES INC Responses due by 3/31/2023. (MCDONALD, KELLY)
February 10, 2023 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Brad Weeks re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by CITY OF SOUTH PORTLAND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 1981 Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Art. IV Ch. 22 - 1975 Code of Ordinances, #3 Exhibit 3 - Art. IV & Art. XIII Ch. 22 - Current Code of Ordinances, #4 Exhibit 4 - Joint Sewer Service Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Sewer User Agreement)(BROGAN, JONATHAN)
February 10, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by CITY OF SOUTH PORTLAND. Reply due by 2/24/2023. (BROGAN, JONATHAN)
February 10, 2023 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by CITY OF SOUTH PORTLAND.(BROGAN, JONATHAN)
February 10, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order per order no. 16: Reply due by 2/27/2023. (clp)
January 27, 2023 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by STATE MANUFACTURED HOMES INC. (BEAGLE, C.)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time - By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (mnd)
January 26, 2023 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by CITY OF SOUTH PORTLAND Responses due by 2/16/2023. (PATTERSHALL, BRADFORD) Modified on 1/26/2023 to clean up docket text (clp).
January 26, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Per Order #16: Responses due by 2/10/2023. Reply due by 2/27/2023. (mnd)
January 26, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for CITY OF SOUTH PORTLAND - Per Order #16: Answer or Motion to Dismiss due by 2/10/2023. (mnd)
January 26, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Per Order #16: Response due by 2/27/2023. (mnd)
January 25, 2023 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Mark V. Franco re #12 Response in Opposition to Motion for Temporary Injunctive Relief on Notice filed by TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH. (FRANCO, MARK)
January 25, 2023 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Brian Longstaff re #12 Response in Opposition to Motion for Temporary Injunctive Relief on Notice filed by TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Town's Zoning Ordinance)(FRANCO, MARK)
January 25, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH. Reply due by 2/8/2023. (FRANCO, MARK)
January 25, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH Responses due by 2/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - Joint Sewer Service Agreement, #2 Exhibit 6 - Findings of Fact Regarding Conditional Approval, #3 Exhibit 7 - SMH Administrative Appeal to ZBA)(FRANCO, MARK)
January 25, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Per order no. 10: Reply due by 2/13/2023. (clp)
January 19, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to STATE MANUFACTURED HOMES INC : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/23/2023. (clp)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Answer and Respond to Motion for TRO. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (clp)
January 13, 2023 Set Answer Deadline per order no. 10: Defendants Answers due by 1/27/2023. (clp)
January 13, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - per order no. 10: Responses due by 1/27/2023. Reply due by 2/13/2023. (clp)
January 12, 2023 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Answer and Respond to Motion for TRO by TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH Responses due by 2/2/2023. (FRANCO, MARK)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE JON D. LEVY for all further proceedings By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mlm)
January 11, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADFORD A. PATTERSHALL on behalf of CITY OF SOUTH PORTLAND (PATTERSHALL, BRADFORD)
January 11, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN W. BROGAN on behalf of CITY OF SOUTH PORTLAND (BROGAN, JONATHAN)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by STATE MANUFACTURED HOMES INC. Counsel are ordered to confer and report a proposed briefing schedule to the Court by close of business on 1/12/2023. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mmy)
January 11, 2023 Set Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/18/2023. (mmy)
January 11, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH: Answer due by 1/18/2023. (mmy)
January 11, 2023 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2747947.), filed by TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH.(FRANCO, MARK)
January 10, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed in State Court on 12/20/2022 by STATE MANUFACTURED HOMES INC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Theresa M. Desfosses) (mmy)
January 10, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mmy)
January 10, 2023 Filing 2 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint Exhibit 1, #3 Complaint Exhibit 2, #4 Complaint Exhibit 3, #5 Complaint Exhibit 4, #6 State Civil Cover Sheet, #7 State Docket Record) (mmy)
January 10, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number PORSC-CV-2022-416. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH. (Service of Process Deadline 4/10/2023) Fee due by 1/12/2023. (mmy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE MANUFACTURED HOMES INC v. CITY OF SOUTH PORTLAND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE MANUFACTURED HOMES INC
Represented By: C. ALAN BEAGLE
Represented By: DAVID A. LOURIE
Represented By: KELLY W. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF SOUTH PORTLAND
Represented By: BRADFORD A. PATTERSHALL
Represented By: JONATHAN W. BROGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH
Represented By: CAREY GUSTANSKI
Represented By: MARK V. FRANCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?