LAVIGNE v. GREAT SALT BAY COMMUNITY SCHOOL BOARD et al
Plaintiff: AMBER LAVIGNE
Defendant: GREAT SALT BAY COMMUNITY SCHOOL BOARD, SAMUEL ROY, KIM SCHAFF, LYNSEY JOHNSTON and JESSICA BERK
Case Number: 2:2023cv00158
Filed: April 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by JESSICA BERK, GREAT SALT BAY COMMUNITY SCHOOL BOARD, LYNSEY JOHNSTON, SAMUEL ROY, KIM SCHAFF.(HEWEY, MELISSA)
June 2, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by JESSICA BERK, GREAT SALT BAY COMMUNITY SCHOOL BOARD, LYNSEY JOHNSTON, SAMUEL ROY, KIM SCHAFF Responses due by 6/23/2023. (HEWEY, MELISSA)
April 14, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed SAMUEL ROY waiver sent on 4/5/2023. (SHELTON, ADAM)
April 14, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed LYNSEY JOHNSTON waiver sent on 4/5/2023. (SHELTON, ADAM)
April 14, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed KIM SCHAFF waiver sent on 4/5/2023. (SHELTON, ADAM)
April 14, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed JESSICA BERK waiver sent on 4/5/2023. (SHELTON, ADAM)
April 14, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed GREAT SALT BAY COMMUNITY SCHOOL BOARD waiver sent on 4/5/2023. (SHELTON, ADAM)
April 14, 2023 Set Answer Deadlines for GREAT SALT BAY COMMUNITY SCHOOL BOARD, LYNSEY JOHNSTON, SAMUEL ROY, KIM SCHAFF, JESSICA BERK in accordance with ECF Nos. 7-11 Waivers of Service Returned Executed-Sent 4/5/2023: Answers due by 6/5/2023. (clp)
April 13, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. WEIDNER on behalf of All Defendants (WEIDNER, SUSAN)
April 13, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA A. HEWEY on behalf of All Defendants (HEWEY, MELISSA)
April 5, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam C. Shelton filed by BRETT D. BABER on behalf of AMBER LAVIGNE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2782161.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (BABER, BRETT)
April 5, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GREAT SALT BAY COMMUNITY SCHOOL BOARD, LYNSEY JOHNSTON, SAMUEL ROY, KIM SCHAFF, JESSICA BERK. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons-Samuel Roy, #2 Summons-Kim Schaff, #3 Summons-Lynsey Johnston, #4 Summons-Jessica Berk)(clp)
April 5, 2023 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2782157.), filed by AMBER LAVIGNE.(BABER, BRETT)
April 5, 2023 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney ADAM C SHELTON must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 4/12/2023. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (clp)
April 4, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (clp)
April 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GREAT SALT BAY COMMUNITY SCHOOL BOARD, LYNSEY JOHNSTON, SAMUEL ROY, KIM SCHAFF, JESSICA BERK PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by AMBER LAVIGNE. (Service of Process Deadline 7/3/2023) Fee due by 4/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Photograph of Chest Binders, #2 Exhibit 2-Letter from Maine Child Protective Services, #3 Exhibit 3-12/19/22 Statement of the GSB Board Chair, Samuel Belknap, III, #4 Exhibit 4-1/14/23 Statement of GSB School Board, #5 Exhibit 5-2/26/23 Letter from Principal Kim Schaff to Members of the GSB School Community, #6 Exhibit 6-GSB Community School Transgender Student Guidelines Policy Code JB, #7 Exhibit 7- GSB CSD Policy-Staff Conduct with Students)(clp) Modified on 4/5/202 to add defendant JESSICA BERK (clp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAVIGNE v. GREAT SALT BAY COMMUNITY SCHOOL BOARD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMBER LAVIGNE
Represented By: ADAM C. SHELTON
Represented By: BRETT D. BABER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREAT SALT BAY COMMUNITY SCHOOL BOARD
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Represented By: SUSAN M. WEIDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL ROY
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Represented By: SUSAN M. WEIDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM SCHAFF
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Represented By: SUSAN M. WEIDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNSEY JOHNSTON
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Represented By: SUSAN M. WEIDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA BERK
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Represented By: SUSAN M. WEIDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?