UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SHELTON et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER A SHELTON, JOANNA SHELTON, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, MORTGAGE LENDERS NETWORK USA INC, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, WILLIAM SWARTZBAUGH, QUANG NGUYEN, JEFFREY HARDER, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES and TOWN OF YARMOUTH DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE
Case Number: 2:2023cv00173
Filed: April 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on Stipulation Regarding Defendant Town of Yarmouth's Involvement in the Case granting #13 Motion for Order. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (slg)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to June 26, 2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Order entering attached stipulation and order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Responses due by 6/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order and Stipulation)(SEITZ, LEE)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by CHRISTOPHER A SHELTON, JOANNA SHELTON Responses due by 6/23/2023. (ROSENTHAL, DANIEL)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by ZACHARY B. BRANDWEIN on behalf of TOWN OF YARMOUTH DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE (BRANDWEIN, ZACHARY)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Reset Answer Deadline for CHRISTOPHER A SHELTON, JOANNA SHELTON per order no. 14: Answer due by 6/26/2023. (clp)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC waiver sent on 5/4/2023. (SEITZ, LEE)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY waiver sent on 5/4/2023. (SEITZ, LEE)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. JOANNA SHELTON served on 5/13/2023. (SEITZ, LEE)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. CHRISTOPHER A SHELTON served on 5/13/2023. (SEITZ, LEE) Modified on 5/23/2023 to correct date served (slg).
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by LEE SEITZ on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (SEITZ, LEE)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Answer Deadline Regarding Waiver of Service Executed for DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY and MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC : Answer due by 7/5/2023. (jwr)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed for CHRISTOPHER A SHELTON and JOANNA SHELTON : Answer due by 6/5/2023. (jwr)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MAINE REVENUE SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Tax Lien Amount and Priority Position)(HUSAR, KAITLYN)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LIS PENDENS. (jwr)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CHRISTOPHER A SHELTON, JOANNA SHELTON. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons for Joanna Shelton)(jwr)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, JEFFREY HARDER, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, MORTGAGE LENDERS NETWORK USA INC, QUANG NGUYEN, CHRISTOPHER A SHELTON, JOANNA SHELTON, WILLIAM SWARTZBAUGH, TOWN OF YARMOUTH DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE with Jury Demand, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Service of Process Deadline 7/17/2023) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Warranty Deed)(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SHELTON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: RYAN D. GALISEWSKI
Represented By: LEE SEITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER A SHELTON
Represented By: DANIEL L. ROSENTHAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOANNA SHELTON
Represented By: DANIEL L. ROSENTHAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTGAGE LENDERS NETWORK USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM SWARTZBAUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUANG NGUYEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY HARDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE REVENUE SERVICES
Represented By: KAITLYN M. HUSAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF YARMOUTH DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE
Represented By: ZACHARY B. BRANDWEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?