PROVENCHER v. SANOFI US SERVICES INC et al
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH PROVENCHER
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US INC and SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00222
Filed: May 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2023 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR: Telephone Conference held. (Court Reporter: Tammy Martell) (jad)
July 24, 2023 Set Deadlines per directive of U.S. District Judge John A. Woodcock, Jr.: Motion to Amend Complaint due by 8/7/2023. (jad)
July 14, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 7/24/2023 01:00 PM before JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK JR. Call-in information has been provided to counsel. (jad)
July 12, 2023 Filing 19 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Spencer P. Browne filed by KEVIN M. FITZGERALD on behalf of ELIZABETH PROVENCHER (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2826439.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (FITZGERALD, KEVIN)
June 29, 2023 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan J. Browne filed by KEVIN M. FITZGERALD on behalf of ELIZABETH PROVENCHER (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2820956.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (FITZGERALD, KEVIN)
June 29, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN M. FITZGERALD on behalf of ELIZABETH PROVENCHER (FITZGERALD, KEVIN)
June 23, 2023 Set Deadlines as to Counsel for Plaintiff ELIZABETH PROVENCHER, Ryane J. Browne and Spencer Paul Browne : Counsel to obtain local counsel and Pro Hac Vice Certificate per Local Rule 83.1. due by 6/30/2023. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (jad)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion by Attorneys Adrienne L. Byard and Matt DePaz to Withdraw as Attorney. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
June 13, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION by Attorney Adrienne L. Byard and Matt DePaz to Withdraw as Attorney by SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC Responses due by 7/5/2023. (WEISSHAAR, JESSE)
June 6, 2023 Filing 14 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Torrey M. Peterson filed by JESSE E. WEISSHAAR on behalf of All Defendants (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2810150.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (WEISSHAAR, JESSE)
June 6, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Harley Ratliff filed by JESSE E. WEISSHAAR on behalf of All Defendants (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2809836.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (WEISSHAAR, JESSE)
June 6, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Kaufman filed by JESSE E. WEISSHAAR on behalf of All Defendants (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2809815.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (WEISSHAAR, JESSE)
June 6, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nancy Elizabeth Donahue filed by JESSE E. WEISSHAAR on behalf of All Defendants (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2809784.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (WEISSHAAR, JESSE)
June 6, 2023 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Nancy Elizabeth Donahue must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 6/20/2023. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (jad)
June 5, 2023 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC. (WEISSHAAR, JESSE)
June 5, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSE E. WEISSHAAR on behalf of All Defendants (WEISSHAAR, JESSE)
May 31, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-10992. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 31, 2023 Set Deadlines : NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from all counsel by 6/14/2023. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, all Attorneys must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 6/14/2023. (jad)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to District of Maine. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/12/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 15836) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]
May 24, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Case Specific) (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4)(Kaufman, Christopher) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]
May 18, 2023 Filing 5 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer. First Attached Document: Index of Attached Documents (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7, #8 8, #9 9, #10 10, #11 11, #12 12, #13 13, #14 14, #15 15, #16 16, #17 17, #18 18, #19 19, #20 20, #21 21, #22 22, #23 23, #24 24, #25 25, #26 26, #27 27, #28 28, #29 29, #30 30, #31 31, #32 32, #33 33, #34 34, #35 35, #36 36, #37 37, #38 38, #39 39, #40 40, #41 41, #42 42, #43 43, #44 44, #45 45, #46 46, #47 47, #48 48, #49 49, #50 50, #51 51, #52 52, #53 53, #54 54, #55 55, #56 56, #57 57, #58 58, #59 59, #60 60, #61 61, #62 62, #63 63, #64 64, #65 65, #66 66, #67 67, #68 68, #69 69, #70 70, #71 71, #72 72, #73 73, #74 74, #75 75, #76 76, #77 77, #78 78, #79 79, #80 80, #81 81, #82 82, #83 83, #84 84, #85 85, #86 86, #87 87, #88 88, #89 89, #90 90, #91 91, #92 92, #93 93, #94 94, #95 95, #96 96, #97 97, #98 98, #99 99, #100 100, #101 101, #102 102, #103 103, #104 104, #105 105, #106 106, #107 107, #108 108, #109 109, #110 110, #111 111, #112 112, #113 113, #114 114, #115 115, #116 116)(Moore, Douglas) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.] Modified on 5/31/2023 to add text to indicate that the first attached document is an index containing descriptions of all attachments (mnd).
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7234604) filed by Elizabeth Provencher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Spencer Paul Browne added to party Elizabeth Provencher(pty:pla).(Browne, Spencer) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROVENCHER v. SANOFI US SERVICES INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC
Represented By: ADRIENNE L BYARD
Represented By: HARLEY VICTOR RATLIFF
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J KAUFMAN
Represented By: TORREY MICHELLE PETERSON
Represented By: MATT DEPAZ
Represented By: NANCY ELIZABETH DONAHUE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. KAUFMAN
Represented By: JESSE E. WEISSHAAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS US INC
Represented By: HARLEY VICTOR RATLIFF
Represented By: ADRIENNE L BYARD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J KAUFMAN
Represented By: TORREY MICHELLE PETERSON
Represented By: MATT DEPAZ
Represented By: NANCY ELIZABETH DONAHUE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. KAUFMAN
Represented By: JESSE E. WEISSHAAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J KAUFMAN
Represented By: HARLEY VICTOR RATLIFF
Represented By: ADRIENNE L BYARD
Represented By: MATT DEPAZ
Represented By: TORREY MICHELLE PETERSON
Represented By: NANCY ELIZABETH DONAHUE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. KAUFMAN
Represented By: JESSE E. WEISSHAAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH PROVENCHER
Represented By: SPENCER PAUL BROWNE
Represented By: RYAN J. BROWNE
Represented By: SPENCER P. BROWNE
Represented By: KEVIN M. FITZGERALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?