MISSION WORKING DOGS et al v. BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC et al
Plaintiff: MISSION WORKING DOGS, CHRISTINA GARDNER, ANDRE BEAUDOIN, TRINA BEAUDOIN, COLLEEN LANDRY, ANGELICA DWYER, JOLEE BEATTIE, AMES ANASTASIA, JOSHUA GOULD, THERESEA BRILLIANT and MELANIE SPARKS
Defendant: BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC and GGP-MAINE MALL LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00230
Filed: June 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Referring Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
2 Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 American Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Objection to Scheduling Order. Deadline for Initial Disclosure 08/10/2023, deadline for Amendment of the Pleadings and Joinder of Parties 09/21/2023, Plaintiff to designate experts by 11/21/2023, Defendants to designate experts by 12/22/2023, discovery deadline 01/31/2024, deadline to file Notice of Intent to file Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Pre-filing Conference 02/07/2024, deadline for dispositive motions and Daubert/Kumho motions 02/21/2024, case ready for trial 04/01/2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN)
July 27, 2023 Filing 14 Joint OBJECTION to #7 Scheduling Order, filed by AMES ANASTASIA, JOLEE BEATTIE, ANDRE BEAUDOIN, TRINA BEAUDOIN, THERESEA BRILLIANT, ANGELICA DWYER, CHRISTINA GARDNER, JOSHUA GOULD, COLLEEN LANDRY, MISSION WORKING DOGS, MELANIE SPARKS. Responses due by 8/17/2023. (DIETERICH, AMY)
July 27, 2023 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines - per Order No. 15: Discovery due by 1/31/2024. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 2/7/2024. Motions due by 2/21/2024. Ready for Trial on 4/1/2024. (jad)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Attorney Pross to Withdraw as Attorney and to Substitute Attorney Dieterich as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN)
July 25, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION by Attorney James Pross to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute by AMES ANASTASIA, JOLEE BEATTIE, ANDRE BEAUDOIN, TRINA BEAUDOIN, THERESEA BRILLIANT, ANGELICA DWYER, CHRISTINA GARDNER, JOSHUA GOULD, COLLEEN LANDRY, MISSION WORKING DOGS, MELANIE SPARKS Responses due by 8/15/2023. (DIETERICH, AMY)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and for Substitution of Counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN)
July 20, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION by Attorney Amy Dieterich to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute by AMES ANASTASIA, JOLEE BEATTIE, ANDRE BEAUDOIN, TRINA BEAUDOIN, THERESEA BRILLIANT, ANGELICA DWYER, CHRISTINA GARDNER, JOSHUA GOULD, COLLEEN LANDRY, MISSION WORKING DOGS, MELANIE SPARKS Responses due by 8/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DIETERICH, AMY) Modified on 7/21/2023 to remove duplicative text of attachment (jad).
July 17, 2023 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GGP-MAINE MALL LLC. (SCOTT, K.)
July 17, 2023 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC. (SCOTT, K.)
July 10, 2023 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/17/2023. (jad)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/24/2023. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 11/30/2023. Motions due by 12/14/2023. Ready for Trial on 2/5/2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (jad)
July 5, 2023 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC, GGP-MAINE MALL LLC.(SCOTT, K.)
June 21, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANGELICA DWYER, MELANIE SPARKS, CHRISTINA GARDNER, TRINA BEAUDOIN, COLLEEN LANDRY, JOSHUA GOULD, AMES ANASTASIA, MISSION WORKING DOGS, JOLEE BEATTIE, THERESEA BRILLIANT, ANDRE BEAUDOIN. BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC served on 6/13/2023. (DIETERICH, AMY) Modified on 6/21/2023 to correct served date to 6/13 (jad).
June 21, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANGELICA DWYER, MELANIE SPARKS, CHRISTINA GARDNER, TRINA BEAUDOIN, COLLEEN LANDRY, JOSHUA GOULD, AMES ANASTASIA, MISSION WORKING DOGS, JOLEE BEATTIE, THERESEA BRILLIANT, ANDRE BEAUDOIN. GGP-MAINE MALL LLC served on 6/13/2023. (DIETERICH, AMY)
June 21, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for Brookfield Properties Retail Inc, GGP-Maine Mall LLC : Answer due by 8/14/2023. (jad)
June 21, 2023 Reset Answer Deadline for Brookfield Properties Retail Inc, GGP-Maine Mall LLC per summons returned executed No. 4, 5: Answer due by 7/5/2023. Deadline reset as previously set deadlines calculated in error. (jad)
June 9, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Brookfield Properties)(jad)
June 8, 2023 Case Randomly Reassigned to JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL no longer assigned to the case. (jwr)
June 6, 2023 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2810063.), filed by ANGELICA DWYER, MELANIE SPARKS, CHRISTINA GARDNER, TRINA BEAUDOIN, COLLEEN LANDRY, JOSHUA GOULD, AMES ANASTASIA, MISSION WORKING DOGS, JOLEE BEATTIE, THERESEA BRILLIANT, ANDRE BEAUDOIN.(DIETERICH, AMY)
June 5, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (lrt)
June 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC, GGP-MAINE MALL LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ANGELICA DWYER, MELANIE SPARKS, CHRISTINA GARDNER, TRINA BEAUDOIN, COLLEEN LANDRY, JOSHUA GOULD, AMES ANASTASIA, MISSION WORKING DOGS, JOLEE BEATTIE, THERESEA BRILLIANT, ANDRE BEAUDOIN. (Service of Process Deadline 9/5/2023) Fee due by 6/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(lrt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MISSION WORKING DOGS et al v. BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISSION WORKING DOGS
Represented By: AMY P. DIETERICH
Represented By: JAMES F. PROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA GARDNER
Represented By: AMY P. DIETERICH
Represented By: JAMES F. PROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRE BEAUDOIN
Represented By: AMY P. DIETERICH
Represented By: JAMES F. PROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRINA BEAUDOIN
Represented By: AMY P. DIETERICH
Represented By: JAMES F. PROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLLEEN LANDRY
Represented By: AMY P. DIETERICH
Represented By: JAMES F. PROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELICA DWYER
Represented By: AMY P. DIETERICH
Represented By: JAMES F. PROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOLEE BEATTIE
Represented By: AMY P. DIETERICH
Represented By: JAMES F. PROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMES ANASTASIA
Represented By: AMY P. DIETERICH
Represented By: JAMES F. PROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA GOULD
Represented By: AMY P. DIETERICH
Represented By: JAMES F. PROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERESEA BRILLIANT
Represented By: AMY P. DIETERICH
Represented By: JAMES F. PROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELANIE SPARKS
Represented By: AMY P. DIETERICH
Represented By: JAMES F. PROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC
Represented By: K. JOSHUA SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGP-MAINE MALL LLC
Represented By: K. JOSHUA SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?