HOSPITAL AMERIMED CANCUN S A DE C V v. MARTINS POINT HEALTH CARE INC
Plaintiff: HOSPITAL AMERIMED CANCUN S A DE C V
Defendant: MARTINS POINT HEALTH CARE INC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00258
Filed: June 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2023 Filing 14 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian P. Dunphy filed by TIMOTHY J. MCKEON on behalf of MARTINS POINT HEALTH CARE INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2839211.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (MCKEON, TIMOTHY)
August 11, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Laura E. Martin filed by TIMOTHY J. MCKEON on behalf of MARTINS POINT HEALTH CARE INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2839203.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (MCKEON, TIMOTHY)
August 11, 2023 Filing 12 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MARTINS POINT HEALTH CARE INC. (MCKEON, TIMOTHY)
August 11, 2023 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MARTINS POINT HEALTH CARE INC. (MCKEON, TIMOTHY)
August 11, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY J. MCKEON on behalf of MARTINS POINT HEALTH CARE INC (MCKEON, TIMOTHY)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to September 22, 2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 11, 2023 Reset Answer Deadline : Answer due by 9/22/2023. (cjd)
August 10, 2023 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by HOSPITAL AMERIMED CANCUN S A DE C V Responses due by 8/31/2023. (DARLING, MARK)
August 10, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #6 Stipulation: This docket entry has been modified to indicate it was filed in error. Counsel are directed to refile as a Motion to Extend Time to Answer. (mmy)
August 10, 2023 Filing 6 **FILED IN ERROR** STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by HOSPITAL AMERIMED CANCUN S A DE C V. (DARLING, MARK) Modified on 8/10/2023 to indicate filed in error (mmy).
July 24, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by HOSPITAL AMERIMED CANCUN S A DE C V. MARTINS POINT HEALTH CARE INC served on 7/20/2023. (DARLING, MARK)
July 24, 2023 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Affidavit of Service for MARTINS POINT HEALTH CARE INC: Answer due by 8/10/2023. (mmy)
June 30, 2023 Filing 4 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HOSPITAL AMERIMED CANCUN S A DE C V. (DARLING, MARK)
June 26, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MARTINS POINT HEALTH CARE INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (jwr)
June 26, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
June 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by HOSPITAL AMERIMED CANCUN S A DE C V against MARTINS POINT HEALTH CARE INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS.. (Service of Process Deadline 9/25/2023) Fee due by 6/28/2023. Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Diversity Disclosure Statement due by 7/3/2023.(jwr)
June 26, 2023 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2819369.), filed by HOSPITAL AMERIMED CANCUN S A DE C V.(DARLING, MARK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOSPITAL AMERIMED CANCUN S A DE C V v. MARTINS POINT HEALTH CARE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOSPITAL AMERIMED CANCUN S A DE C V
Represented By: MARK A. DARLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTINS POINT HEALTH CARE INC
Represented By: TIMOTHY J. MCKEON
Represented By: LAURA E. MARTIN
Represented By: BRIAN P. DUNPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?