BWC DEEP BROOK LLC et al v. FENDERSON et al
Plaintiff: BWC DEEP BROOK LLC and BWC SWAN POND CREEK LLC
Defendant: JOHN R FENDERSON and LINDA L FENDERSON
Case Number: 2:2023cv00291
Filed: July 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2023 Filing 16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by BWC DEEP BROOK LLC, BWC SWAN POND CREEK LLC (REICHL, NOLAN)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT: A settlement Conference having been held this date and counsel having advised the Court on 8/4/2023 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within thirty (30) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a).( Stipulation of Dismissal due by 9/5/2023.) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (jwr)
August 4, 2023 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF: Settlement Conference held. Case settled. (Court Reporter: No court reporter present) (MGW)
August 3, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by ROY T. PIERCE on behalf of All Defendants (PIERCE, ROY)
August 2, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing (changing time only): Settlement Conference reset for 8/4/2023 10:30 AM in Magistrate Judge Wolf's Chambers before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (jwr)
August 2, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for John Fenderson, Linda Fenderson per executed summons No. 6: Answer due by 8/17/2023. (jad)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 8/4/2023 09:30 AM in Magistrate Judge Wolf's Chambers before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF, In Camera Settlement Papers due by noon on 8/3/2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (jwr)
August 1, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JOHN R FENDERSON (jwr)
August 1, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance filed by JOHN R FENDERSON (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr)
August 1, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by LINDA L FENDERSON (jwr)
August 1, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance filed by LINDA L FENDERSON (jwr)
August 1, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by BWC SWAN POND CREEK LLC, BWC DEEP BROOK LLC. All Defendants, summons returned executed on 7/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on Linda Fenderson)(REICHL, NOLAN) Modified on 8/2/2023 to add date of service (jad).
July 25, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to JOHN R FENDERSON, LINDA L FENDERSON. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons to Linda Fenderson)(cjd)
July 25, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BWC DEEP BROOK LLC and BWC SWAN POND CREEK LLC Responses due by 8/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Trevor Hardy, #2 Exhibit A to Hardy Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Hardy Declaration)(cjd)
July 25, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND DIVERSITY STATEMENT by BWC DEEP BROOK LLC, BWC SWAN POND CREEK LLC. (cjd) Modified on 7/25/2023 to include diversity statement (cjd).
July 25, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cjd)
July 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN R FENDERSON, LINDA L FENDERSON PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by BWC SWAN POND CREEK LLC, BWC DEEP BROOK LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 10/23/2023) Fee due by 7/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint)(cjd)
July 25, 2023 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2832101.), filed by BWC SWAN POND CREEK LLC, BWC DEEP BROOK LLC.(REICHL, NOLAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BWC DEEP BROOK LLC et al v. FENDERSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BWC DEEP BROOK LLC
Represented By: JULIA BRENNAN MACDONALD
Represented By: NOLAN L. REICHL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BWC SWAN POND CREEK LLC
Represented By: JULIA BRENNAN MACDONALD
Represented By: NOLAN L. REICHL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN R FENDERSON
Represented By: ROY T. PIERCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA L FENDERSON
Represented By: ROY T. PIERCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?