SEBAGO LAND DEVELOPERS INC v. CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Counter Defendant: SEBAGO LAND DEVELOPERS INC
Interested Party: MARCUS HILTON
Case Number: 2:2023cv00320
Filed: August 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2023 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM by CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY in support of #25 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Policy), #2 Exhibit B (Underlying Complaint))(GIBBONS, BRIAN)
October 6, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY Responses due by 10/27/2023. (GIBBONS, BRIAN)
October 6, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(c) by SEBAGO LAND DEVELOPERS INC Responses due by 10/27/2023. (MARJERISON, THOMAS)
September 19, 2023 Set Deadlines per Order No. 23: Simultaneous Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings due by 10/6/2023. Simultaneous responses/oppositions to the Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings due 10/27/2023. (jad)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Stay Discovery. The parties have agreed that their insurance coverage dispute presents primarily a legal issue to be determined by the Court and which should be resolved at an early stage of this case. As such, the parties shall file simultaneous Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings by October 6, 2023. Simultaneous oppositions to the Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings shall be filed by October 27, 2023. After decision by the Court, if there are any factual issues or claims remaining, revised scheduling order deadlines shall issue. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN)
September 18, 2023 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery by SEBAGO LAND DEVELOPERS INC Responses due by 10/10/2023. (MARJERISON, THOMAS)
September 18, 2023 Filing 21 Reply to #20 Counterclaim, by SEBAGO LAND DEVELOPERS INC.(MARJERISON, THOMAS) Modified on 9/19/2023 to remove answer to amended complaint language (jad).
September 18, 2023 Filing 20 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against SEBAGO LAND DEVELOPERS INC by CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Policy, #2 Exhibit B: Underlying Complaint)(GIBBONS, BRIAN)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Amend Complaint. The Amended Complaint has been filed at ECF No. 18. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN)
September 14, 2023 Filing 18 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by SEBAGO LAND DEVELOPERS INC. (Service of Process Deadline 12/13/2023)(MARJERISON, THOMAS)
September 14, 2023 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint by SEBAGO LAND DEVELOPERS INC Responses due by 10/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(MARJERISON, THOMAS)
September 12, 2023 Filing 16 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (GIBBONS, BRIAN)
September 12, 2023 Reset Deadlines : Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Diversity Disclosure Statement AS TO CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALITY INSURANCE COMPANY due by 9/15/2023. (jad)
September 11, 2023 Filing 15 REPORT OF CONFERENCE OF COUNSEL. After discussing potential jurisdictional issues with Attorneys Marjerison, Gibbons, and Herbert, the parties all agreed that party-in-interest Marcus Hilton is not a necessary party to this matter. The Plaintiff indicated that it will shortly file an amended complaint that no longer includes Hilton thereby terminating his involvement in this case. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (MGW)
September 11, 2023 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF: Conference of Counsel held. (Court Reporter: Lori Dunbar) (MGW)
September 7, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. HERBERT on behalf of MARCUS HILTON (HERBERT, WILLIAM)
September 6, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Conference of Counsel set for 9/11/2023 01:00 PM via ZOOM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (lcb)
September 1, 2023 Set Deadlines : Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Diversity Disclosure Statement due by 9/8/2023 as to Crum & Forster. (jad)
August 31, 2023 Filing 11 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SEBAGO LAND DEVELOPERS INC. (MARJERISON, THOMAS)
August 31, 2023 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (GIBBONS, BRIAN)
August 30, 2023 Filing 9 Reply to #6 Counterclaim by SEBAGO LAND DEVELOPERS INC.(MARJERISON, THOMAS) Modified on 9/1/2023 to clean up text (jad).
August 28, 2023 Reset Deadlines : Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Diversity Disclosure Statement due by 9/1/2023. (jad)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/12/2024. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 1/19/2024. Motions due by 2/2/2024. Ready for Trial on 4/1/2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (jad)
August 24, 2023 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (GIBBONS, BRIAN)
August 23, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against SEBAGO LAND DEVELOPERS INC by CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Underlying Complaint)(GIBBONS, BRIAN)
August 21, 2023 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (GIBBONS, BRIAN)
August 21, 2023 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SEBAGO LAND DEVELOPERS INC. (MARJERISON, THOMAS)
August 16, 2023 Set Answer Deadline : Answer due by 8/23/2023. (jad)
August 16, 2023 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 8/30/2023. By DEPUTY CLERK: Joanne Deering. (jad)
August 16, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jad)
August 16, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Pleadings Complaint, Civil Summary Sheet, Summons, Notice of Electronic Service from York County Superior Court, case number CV-23-143. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 11/14/2023) Fee due by 8/18/2023. Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Diversity Disclosure Statement due by 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 State court complaint, #2 State court civil summary sheet, #3 State court summons 6/20/2023, #4 State court summons 7/24/2023, #5 State Court Notice of Electronic Service)(jad)
August 16, 2023 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2841390.), filed by CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(GIBBONS, BRIAN)
August 16, 2023 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/23/2023. (jad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEBAGO LAND DEVELOPERS INC v. CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: SEBAGO LAND DEVELOPERS INC
Represented By: THOMAS S. MARJERISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BRIAN MATTHEW GIBBONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MARCUS HILTON
Represented By: WILLIAM C. HERBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?