ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY et al v. BROAN-NUTONE LLC
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY, LINDA J FRANCESCONE, MICHAEL FRANCESCONE and JAMES FRANCESCONE
Defendant: BROAN-NUTONE LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00345
Filed: September 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Deadline to serve Initial Disclosures is extended to October 23, 2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
October 16, 2023 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order to extend Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures deadline by ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY, JAMES FRANCESCONE, LINDA J FRANCESCONE, MICHAEL FRANCESCONE Responses due by 11/6/2023. (BELLEAU, JAMES)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting in part #9 Joint Objection to Scheduling Order. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 2, 2023 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 5/10/2024. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 5/13/2024. Motions due by 5/31/2024. Ready for Trial on 7/1/2024. (MFS)
September 28, 2023 Filing 9 JOINT Proposed Discovery and Motion Filing Plan and objection to scheduling order by BROAN-NUTONE LLC. (BLACK, ANDREW) Modified on 9/29/2023 to add Objection to Scheduling Order (jgd).
September 26, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Benjamin Staherski filed by JAMES E. BELLEAU on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2857900.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (BELLEAU, JAMES)
September 25, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew D. Black filed by JOHANNA L. GAUVREAU on behalf of All Defendants The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (GAUVREAU, JOHANNA)
September 25, 2023 Set Deadlines: Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Andrew D. Black must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 10/2/2023. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (mlm)
September 19, 2023 Filing 6 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY. (BELLEAU, JAMES)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/5/2024. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 2/12/2024. Motions due by 2/26/2024. Ready for Trial on 5/6/2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 18, 2023 Set Deadlines: Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Diversity Disclosure Statement due from ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY by 9/25/2023. (mmy)
September 15, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BROAN-NUTONE LLC.(GAUVREAU, JOHANNA)
September 12, 2023 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2852434.), filed by BROAN-NUTONE LLC.(GAUVREAU, JOHANNA)
September 12, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for BROAN-NUTONE LLC: Answer due by 9/18/2023. (mmy)
September 11, 2023 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by BROAN-NUTONE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Motion of Plaintiff to Admit J. Benjamin Staherski Pro Hac Vice, #5 Exhibit E - Order on Motion of Plaintiff to Admit J. Benjamin Staherski Pro Hac Vice, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Docket Record, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit H - Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests of Defendant Broan-Nutone, LLC)(mmy)
September 11, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mmy)
September 11, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number PORSC-CV-2023-00306. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by BROAN-NUTONE LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 12/11/2023) Fee due by 9/13/2023. Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Diversity Disclosure Statement due by 9/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(mmy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY et al v. BROAN-NUTONE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES E. BELLEAU
Represented By: J. BENJAMIN STAHERSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA J FRANCESCONE
Represented By: JAMES E. BELLEAU
Represented By: J. BENJAMIN STAHERSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL FRANCESCONE
Represented By: JAMES E. BELLEAU
Represented By: J. BENJAMIN STAHERSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES FRANCESCONE
Represented By: JAMES E. BELLEAU
Represented By: J. BENJAMIN STAHERSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROAN-NUTONE LLC
Represented By: JOHANNA L. GAUVREAU
Represented By: ANDREW D. BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?