RILING v. SANOFI US SERVICES INC, et al
Plaintiff: MARGARET RILING
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC and SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC separately, and doing business as WINTHROP US
Case Number: 2:2023cv00420
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Stay. Proceedings and deadlines in this case are stayed until further order of the Court. The parties shall file a status report on or about May 24, 2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
November 30, 2023 Set Deadlines per Order No. 14: Status Report due by 5/24/2024. (jad)
November 28, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay by SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC. No PDF document attached, see ECF No. 12. Responses due by 12/19/2023. (jad)
November 28, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement (Pending) and Request to Stay Proceedings by SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC (WEISSHAAR, JESSE)
November 22, 2023 Filing 11 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC. (WEISSHAAR, JESSE)
November 20, 2023 Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/24/2023. Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Diversity Disclosure Statement due by 11/24/2023. Pro Hac Vice Certificate as to attorney MICHAEL P. MCGARTLAND due by 11/24/2023. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (jad)
November 14, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Torrey M. Peterson filed by JESSE E. WEISSHAAR on behalf of SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2877797.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (WEISSHAAR, JESSE)
November 14, 2023 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC. (WEISSHAAR, JESSE)
November 14, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSE E. WEISSHAAR on behalf of SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC (WEISSHAAR, JESSE)
November 9, 2023 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-10129.
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TRANSFER ORDER- Case transferred to District of Maine. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/9/2023.]
November 9, 2023 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 11/17/2023. Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Diversity Disclosure Statements due by 11/17/2023. (mnd)
November 9, 2023 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney MICHAEL P. MCGARTLAND must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 11/17/2023. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from MICHAEL P. MCGARTLAND and TORREY MICHELLE PETERSON by 11/17/2023. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (mnd)
October 6, 2023 Filing 5 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer of Orders, #2 Exhibit B - PTO, #3 Exhibit C - CMO, #4 Exhibit D - Pleadings, #5 Exhibit E - Orders on Dispositive Motions, #6 Exhibit F - Daubert Orders, #7 Exhibit G - MIL Orders)(Moore, Douglas) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/9/2023.]
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/9/2023.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/9/2023.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/9/2023.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sanofi US Services Inc. f/k/a Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, separately, and doing business as Winthrop U.S. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7200623) filed by Margaret Riling. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Michael P. McGartland added to party Margaret Riling(pty:pla).(McGartland, Michael) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/9/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RILING v. SANOFI US SERVICES INC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC
Represented By: TORREY MICHELLE PETERSON
Represented By: JESSE E. WEISSHAAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS US INC
Represented By: TORREY MICHELLE PETERSON
Represented By: JESSE E. WEISSHAAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC
Represented By: TORREY MICHELLE PETERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC separately, and doing business as WINTHROP US
Represented By: TORREY MICHELLE PETERSON
Represented By: JESSE E. WEISSHAAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET RILING
Represented By: MICHAEL P. MCGARTLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?