SGC ENGINEERING LLC v. MACDONALD
Plaintiff: SGC ENGINEERING LLC
Defendant: SCOT A MACDONALD
Case Number: 2:2024cv00086
Filed: March 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2024 Filing 26 STIPULATION ON DOCUMENT PRODUCTION PROTOCOL by SGC ENGINEERING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fields for Production of Paper Documents Converted to Static Images, #2 Exhibit B - Fields for Production of ESI)(REICHL, NOLAN)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Extend Time. Document production protocol due May 17, 2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN)
May 10, 2024 Filing 24 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Submit Document Production Protocol by SGC ENGINEERING LLC Responses due by 5/31/2024. (REICHL, NOLAN)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY AND RULE 502(d) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Confidentiality Order By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (jam)
May 9, 2024 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by SGC ENGINEERING LLC Responses due by 5/30/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Redlined Order)(REICHL, NOLAN)
May 6, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding 20 Order on Objection to Scheduling Order: The ready for trial date was changed from 2/3/2024 to the correct date of 2/3/2025 per directive of Magistrate Judge Wolf. (jam)
May 6, 2024 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines - per Order No 20: Discovery due by 10/29/2024. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 11/5/2024. Motions due by 11/19/2024. Ready for Trial on 2/3/2025. (jam)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Objection to Scheduling Order. The five-deposition limit shall exclude depositions of expert witnesses or third-party witnesses who appear subject to subpoena. Initial disclosures served by May 10, 2024. The parties shall submit an agreed upon document production protocol and an agreed upon confidentiality order by May 10, 2024. The parties shall submit a joint motion for limits on third-party depositions by June 28, 2024. Amendment of the pleadings and joinder of parties due by August 27, 2024. Plaintiff shall designate experts by August 27, 2024. Defendant shall designate experts by October 1, 2024. Discovery shall be complete by October 29, 2024. Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due November 5, 2024. Dispositive motions and Daubert/Kumho motions due November 19, 2024. Case ready for trial on February 3, 2025. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN) Modified on 5/6/2024 to correct year of ready for trial deadline, per directive of Magistrate Judge Wolf. (jam).
May 3, 2024 Filing 19 Joint OBJECTION to #15 Scheduling Order, filed by SGC ENGINEERING LLC. Responses due by 5/24/2024. (REICHL, NOLAN)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Oral Argument. The Court will schedule the motion at the mutual convenience of the Court and the parties. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jam)
April 25, 2024 Filing 17 Motion for Oral Argument on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by SGC ENGINEERING LLC (REICHL, NOLAN) Modified on 4/26/2024 to modify event type (jam).
April 25, 2024 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SGC ENGINEERING LLC. (REICHL, NOLAN)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/30/2024. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 9/6/2024. Motions due by 9/20/2024. Ready for Trial on 12/2/2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (clp)
April 12, 2024 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SCOT A MACDONALD. NO PDF attached to this entry. To see document see ECF No. [13-1]. (clp)
April 11, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM CYRUS BAKER on behalf of SCOT A MACDONALD (Attachments: #1 Individual Disclosure Statement)(BAKER, WILLIAM)
April 11, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SCOT A MACDONALD. Reply due by 4/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Scot A. MacDonald, #2 Affidavit of Scot A. MacDonald)(BAKER, WILLIAM)
April 11, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by SCOT A MACDONALD.(BAKER, WILLIAM)
April 11, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Intent to Seek Default and Request for Entry of Preliminary Injunction by SGC ENGINEERING LLC (REICHL, NOLAN)
April 11, 2024 Set Deadlines : No answer or responsive pleading filed by SCOT A MACDONALD. Check for the Filing of a Motion for Entry of Default on 5/10/2024. (mnd)
March 21, 2024 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed by SGC ENGINEERING LLC. SCOT A MACDONALD served on 3/20/2024. (REICHL, NOLAN) Modified on 3/21/2024 to reflect summons filed (jam).
March 21, 2024 Set Answer Deadline for SCOT A MACDONALD per executed summons No. 9: Answer due by 4/10/2024. (jam)
March 20, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re #7 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Attorney HAROLD D. MOOTY, III for SGC ENGINEERING LLC added to this specific case only. Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Mooty must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 3/27/2024. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (lrt)
March 20, 2024 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Harold D. Mooty III filed by NOLAN L. REICHL on behalf of SGC ENGINEERING LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2929719.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (REICHL, NOLAN)
March 20, 2024 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SGC ENGINEERING LLC. (cjd)
March 20, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SCOT A MACDONALD. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (cjd)
March 20, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by SGC ENGINEERING LLC (cjd)
March 20, 2024 Filing 3 **FILED IN ERROR** RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SGC ENGINEERING LLC. (cjd) Modified on 3/20/2024 to mark as filed in error (jam).
March 20, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cjd)
March 20, 2024 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against SCOT A MACDONALD PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by SGC ENGINEERING LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 6/18/2024) Fee due by 3/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confidential, Intervention and Non-Solicitation Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - LinkedIn Message)(cjd)
March 20, 2024 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMEDC-2929715.), filed by SGC ENGINEERING LLC.(REICHL, NOLAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SGC ENGINEERING LLC v. MACDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SGC ENGINEERING LLC
Represented By: HAROLD D. MOOTY, III
Represented By: NOLAN L. REICHL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOT A MACDONALD
Represented By: WILLIAM CYRUS BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?