UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ZEPF et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: MICHAEL L ZEPF, PATRICIA A ZEPF, HENRY A PYNE, DOROTHY J PYNE and TOWN OF YORK MAINE
Case Number: 2:2024cv00104
Filed: March 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Referring Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH G. TALBOT on behalf of DOROTHY J PYNE, HENRY A PYNE (TALBOT, JOSEPH)
May 24, 2024 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by DOROTHY J PYNE, HENRY A PYNE Responses due by 6/14/2024. (MANHART, ANTHONY)
May 24, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY J. MANHART on behalf of DOROTHY J PYNE, HENRY A PYNE (MANHART, ANTHONY)
May 24, 2024 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed DOROTHY J PYNE waiver sent on 4/2/2024. (KAUFMAN, JOSEPH)
May 24, 2024 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed HENRY A PYNE waiver sent on 4/2/2024. (KAUFMAN, JOSEPH)
May 24, 2024 Set Answer Deadline for DOROTHY J PYNE, HENRY A PYNE per waiver of service executed No. 5, 6: Answer due by 6/3/2024. (jam)
April 23, 2024 Filing 4 LIS PENDENS. (slg)
March 29, 2024 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Henry A Pyne, #2 Summons Michael L Zepf, #3 Summons Patricia A Zepf, #4 Summons Tonw of York Maine)(cjd)
March 29, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cjd)
March 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Service of Process Deadline 6/27/2024)(cjd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ZEPF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: JOSEPH M. KAUFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL L ZEPF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICIA A ZEPF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENRY A PYNE
Represented By: ANTHONY J. MANHART
Represented By: JOSEPH G. TALBOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOROTHY J PYNE
Represented By: ANTHONY J. MANHART
Represented By: JOSEPH G. TALBOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF YORK MAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?