GAMBINO v. BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC
Plaintiff: TONYA GAMBINO, MICHAEL MYERSON, LAURA RUSSELL, LARRY DAVIS, ROBERT HICKMAN, VIRGINIA DEMEL-DUFF, MELODY BOWMAN, KATHY BISHOP, DANIEL EDWARDS, YASMIN ENCARNACION, EMILY COULTER, QUINTON ANDERSON, RANDY BISHOP, KRISTIE IUSHKOVA, SALLY HUGHES, DONALD DEE SMITH, BRANDY BRADY, MYRON NOTTINGHAM, MICHAEL MEYERSON and YASMINE ENCARNACION
Defendant: BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC, ZZ ENTERPRISES LLC doing business as RELIABLE NETWORKS OF MAINE LLC and RELIABLE NETWORKS OF MAINE LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv00146
Filed: April 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2024 Set Answer Deadline for BARRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC, ZZ ENTERPRISES LLC d/b/a RELIABLE NETWORKS OF MAINE LLC: Answer due by 8/2/2024. Answer deadline reset after amendment of parties, due to filing of Amended complaint, ECF 60. (jam)
June 20, 2024 **FILED IN ERROR** Set Answer Deadline for BARRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC, RELIABLE NETWORKS OF MAINE LLC, ZZ ENTERPRISES LLC d/b/a RELIABLE NETWORKS per filing of Amended complaint and Order No. 8: Answer due by 8/2/2024. (jam) Modified on 6/20/2024 to mark as filed in error(jam).
June 18, 2024 Filing 60 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Consolidated Class Action Complaint) against All Defendants, filed by TONYA GAMBINO, DONALD DEE SMITH, LAURA RUSSELL, MYRON NOTTINGHAM, MICHAEL MEYERSON, KRISTIE IUSHKOVA, SALLY HUGHES, ROBERT HICKMAN, YASMINE ENCARNACION, VIRGINIA DEMEL-DUFF, BRANDY BRADY, MELODY BOWMAN, RANDY BISHOP, KATHY BISHOP, QUINTON ANDERSON. (Service of Process Deadline 9/16/2024)(BAUER, DAVID) Modified on 6/20/2024 to clarify document filing name and add filed by Plaintiff names (jam).
June 17, 2024 Reset Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney SHAUN D. LOUGHLIN must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 6/21/2024. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (jam)
June 14, 2024 Filing 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ZZ ENTERPRISES LLC d/b/a RELIABLE NETWORKS waiver sent on 6/13/2024. (NATHAN, STEVEN)
June 12, 2024 Reset Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificates due by 6/18/2024 for MATTHEW FORNARO and CHRISTOPHER WALDEN LEE. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (lcb)
June 11, 2024 Filing 58 NOTICE of APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re #56 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice and #57 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys JAY S. GREGORY and SHAUN D. LOUGHLIN for RELIABLE NETWORKS OF MAINE LLC added to this specific case only. Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney SHAUN D. LOUGHLIN must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 6/14/2024. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (jgd)
June 11, 2024 Filing 57 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shaun D. Loughlin filed by NANCY KELLY on behalf of RELIABLE NETWORKS OF MAINE LLC The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (KELLY, NANCY)
June 11, 2024 Filing 56 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jay S. Gregory filed by NANCY KELLY on behalf of RELIABLE NETWORKS OF MAINE LLC (Total admission fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2965763.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (KELLY, NANCY)
June 11, 2024 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by NANCY KELLY on behalf of RELIABLE NETWORKS OF MAINE LLC (KELLY, NANCY)
June 6, 2024 Filing 54 Summons Issued as to ZZ ENTERPRISES LLC d/b/a RELIABLE NETWORKS. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (jam)
June 4, 2024 Filing 53 AMENDED CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David M. Ross filed by SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ on behalf of BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND) Modified on 6/4/2024 to mark as amended (jam).
June 3, 2024 Set Deadlines : Attorneys MATTHEW FORNARO and CHRISTOPHER WALDEN LEE Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 6/11/2024. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (jam)
June 3, 2024 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney CHRISTOPHER WALDEN LEE must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 6/10/2024. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (jam)
May 31, 2024 Filing 52 NOTICE: Please be advised that in accordance with the Court's Order to consolidate cases, ECF 8, that case 2:24-cv00192-JAW has been consolidated into 2:24-cv-00146-JAW. All further docket entries must be made in the lead case 2:24-cv-00146-JAW. (jam)
May 31, 2024 Filing 51 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding Set Answer Deadlines of 5/29/2024 and 6/3/2024 : Per Order No. 8, Defendants shall have 45 days after the filing of the consolidated class action complaint to answer or otherwise respond. (jam)
May 31, 2024 Filing 50 NOTICE: Please be advised that in accordance with the Court's Order to consolidate cases, ECF No. 8, that case 2:24-cv-00174-JAW has been consolidated into 2:24-cv-00146-JAW. All further docket entries must be made in the lead case 2:24-cv-00146-JAW. (jam)
May 31, 2024 Set Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate re: Attorney MATTHEW FORNARO due by 6/11/2024. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (jam)
May 30, 2024 Filing 49 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Related Case by BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
May 30, 2024 Filing 48 NOTICE re #15 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles E. Schaffer filed by CHARLES E. SCHAFFER: Receipt Number BMEDC-2951217 was refunded in the amount of $200. The correct fee was paid at pleading #28 receipt number AMEDC-2952112. (mlm)
May 28, 2024 Filing 47 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC. (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
May 23, 2024 Filing 46 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Related Case by BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Berry Dunn Consolidation Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Berry Dunn Encarnacion Complaint)(SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
May 20, 2024 Filing 45 NOTICE of APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re #44 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, Attorney DAVID M. ROSS for BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC added to this specific case only. Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Ross must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 5/28/2024. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (lrt)
May 20, 2024 Filing 44 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David M. Ross filed by SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ on behalf of BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number AMEDC-2956331.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
May 20, 2024 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ on behalf of BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
May 20, 2024 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KATHY BISHOP. RELIABLE NETWORKS OF MAINE LLC served on 5/8/2024. (BAUER, DAVID)
May 20, 2024 ** FILED IN ERROR ** Set Answer Deadline for RELIABLE NETWORKS OF MAINE LLC per executed summons No. 42: Answer due by 5/29/2024. (jam) Modified on 5/31/2024 to mark as filed in error (jam).
May 17, 2024 Filing 41 Summons returned executed by KATHY BISHOP. BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC served on 5/13/2024. (BAUER, DAVID) Modified on 5/20/2024 to modify to the correct form of service (jam).
May 17, 2024 ** FILED IN ERROR ** Set Answer Deadline for BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC : Answer due by 6/3/2024. (slg) Modified on 5/31/2024 to mark as filed in error (jam).
May 16, 2024 Reset Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney DANIEL SROURIAN must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 5/22/2024. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (jam)
May 10, 2024 Filing 40 NOTICE of APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re #39 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, Attorney CARL MALMSTROM for DANIEL EDWARDS added to this specific case only. Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Malmstrom must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 5/15/2024. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (lrt)
May 10, 2024 Filing 39 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Carl V. Malmstrom filed by DAVID EDWARD BAUER on behalf of DANIEL EDWARDS (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number AMEDC-2952396.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Malmstrom Federal Court Admissions)(BAUER, DAVID)
May 10, 2024 Filing 38 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by VIRGINIA DEMEL-DUFF. (BAUER, DAVID)
May 10, 2024 Filing 37 NOTICE of APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re #36 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, #33 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, #35 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, #34 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, Attorney TYLER J. BEAN for TONYA GAMBINO,BRYAN L. BLEICHNER,PHILIP J. KRZESKI for MICHAEL MYERSON,JEFF OSTROW for LAURA RUSSELL added to this specific case only. Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Ostrow, Bleichner, Krzeski, and Bean must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 5/15/2024. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (lrt)
May 9, 2024 Filing 36 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tyler Bean filed by DAVID EDWARD BAUER on behalf of TONYA GAMBINO (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number AMEDC-2952277.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Tyler Bean Admissions, #2 Tyler Bean OK Bar Certificate)(BAUER, DAVID)
May 9, 2024 Filing 35 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Philip Krzeski filed by DAVID EDWARD BAUER on behalf of MICHAEL MYERSON (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number AMEDC-2952276.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Philip Krzeski - Admissions)(BAUER, DAVID)
May 9, 2024 Filing 34 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bryan Bleichner filed by DAVID EDWARD BAUER on behalf of MICHAEL MYERSON (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number AMEDC-2952275.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Bryan Bleichner Admissions)(BAUER, DAVID)
May 9, 2024 Filing 33 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeff Ostrow filed by DAVID EDWARD BAUER on behalf of LAURA RUSSELL (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number AMEDC-2952248.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Jeff Ostrow Court Admissions)(BAUER, DAVID)
May 9, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE of APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re #29 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, Attorney BRETT R. COHEN for MELODY BOWMAN added to this specific case only. Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Cohen must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 5/15/2024. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (lrt)
May 9, 2024 Filing 31 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DANIEL EDWARDS. (BAUER, DAVID)
May 9, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re #28 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, Attorney CHARLES E. SCHAFFER for MELODY BOWMAN added to this specific case only. (lrt)
May 9, 2024 Filing 29 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brett R. Cohen filed by DAVID EDWARD BAUER on behalf of MELODY BOWMAN (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number AMEDC-2952116.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (BAUER, DAVID)
May 9, 2024 Filing 28 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles E. Schaffer filed by DAVID EDWARD BAUER on behalf of MELODY BOWMAN (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number AMEDC-2952112.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (BAUER, DAVID)
May 9, 2024 Filing 27 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MICHAEL MYERSON. (BAUER, DAVID)
May 9, 2024 Filing 26 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LAURA RUSSELL. (BAUER, DAVID)
May 9, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re #24 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, Attorney DANIEL SROURIAN for ROBERT HICKMAN added to this specific case only. Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Srourian must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 5/15/2024. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (lrt)
May 9, 2024 Filing 24 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Srourian filed by DAVID EDWARD BAUER on behalf of ROBERT HICKMAN (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number AMEDC-2951595.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (BAUER, DAVID)
May 9, 2024 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ROBERT HICKMAN. (BAUER, DAVID)
May 8, 2024 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MELODY BOWMAN. (BAUER, DAVID)
May 8, 2024 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LARRY DAVIS. (BAUER, DAVID)
May 8, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re #18 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, #19 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, Attorney A. BROOKE MURPHY for VIRGINIA DEMEL-DUFF,MARIYA WEEKES for LAURA RUSSELL added to this specific case only. Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Murphy and Weekes must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 5/15/2024. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (lrt)
May 8, 2024 Filing 19 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mariya Weekes filed by DAVID EDWARD BAUER on behalf of LAURA RUSSELL (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number AMEDC-2951322.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (BAUER, DAVID)
May 8, 2024 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of A. Brooke Murphy filed by DAVID EDWARD BAUER on behalf of VIRGINIA DEMEL-DUFF (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number AMEDC-2951313.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (BAUER, DAVID)
May 8, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re #13 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, #14 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, Attorney JOSEPH M. LYON,KEVIN M. COX for LARRY DAVIS added to this specific case only. Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Attorney Lyon and Cox must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 5/15/2024. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (lrt)
May 8, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re #15 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, Attorney CHARLES E. SCHAFFER for KATHY BISHOP added to this specific case only. (lrt)
May 8, 2024 Filing 15 **FILED IN ERROR** CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles E. Schaffer filed by CHARLES E. SCHAFFER on behalf of KATHY BISHOP (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number BMEDC-2951217.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (SCHAFFER, CHARLES) Modified on 5/9/2024 to mark as filed in error, counsel to refile (jam).
May 8, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin M. Cox filed by DAVID EDWARD BAUER on behalf of LARRY DAVIS (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number AMEDC-2951206.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (BAUER, DAVID)
May 8, 2024 Filing 13 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph M. Lyon filed by DAVID EDWARD BAUER on behalf of LARRY DAVIS (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number AMEDC-2951203.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Lyon Pro Hac certificate - Attachment A)(BAUER, DAVID)
May 8, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re #11 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, Attorney MASON A. BARNEY for TONYA GAMBINO added to this specific case only. Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Mason Barney must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 5/15/2024. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (lrt)
May 7, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mason A. Barney filed by DAVID EDWARD BAUER on behalf of TONYA GAMBINO (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number AMEDC-2950968.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mason Barney - Admissions, #2 Exhibit Mason Barney - NY Certificate of Good Standing)(BAUER, DAVID)
May 7, 2024 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by KATHY BISHOP. (BAUER, DAVID)
May 6, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE: Please be advised that in accordance with the Court's Order to consolidate cases, ECF No. 8, that cases 2:24-cv-00147, 2:24-cv-00148, 2:24-cv-00149, 2:24-cv-00150, 2:24-cv-00151, 2:24-cv-00153, 2:24-cv-00154 and 2:24-cv-00155 have been consolidated into 2:24-cv-00146. 2:24-cv-00146-JAW is now the lead case. All further docket entries must be made in the lead case 2:24-cv-00146-JAW. (jam)
May 6, 2024 Reset Deadlines: (see Order No. 8) Per consolidation of cases: Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, all pro-hac vice attorneys must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 5/10/2024. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. Pro Hac Vice Certificates due by 5/10/2024. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Disclosure Statements due by 5/9/2024. Consolidated Class Action complaint due by 6/18/2024. (jam)
May 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS AND APPOINT INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL granting #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #6 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting #6 Motion for Order to Stay; granting in part and dismissing in part #6 Motion for Approval of Proposed Deadlines By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jam)
May 3, 2024 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TONYA GAMBINO. (BAUER, DAVID)
May 3, 2024 Set Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 5/10/2024. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (jam)
May 3, 2024 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney MASON A. BARNEY must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 5/10/2024. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (jam)
May 2, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases 24-cv-146, 24-cv-147, 24-cv-148, 24-cv-149, 24-cv-150, 24-cv-151, 24-cv-153, 24-cv-154, and 24-cv-155, MOTION for Order Staying Case During Pendency of this Motion and for Approval of Proposed Deadlines by TONYA GAMBINO Responses due by 5/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Consolidate, #2 Exhibit A - Law Firm of Siri Glimstad, #3 Exhibit B - Law Firm of Chestnut Cambronne, #4 Exhibit C - Law Firm of Kopelowitz Ostrow, #5 Exhibit D - Srourian Law Firm, #6 Exhibit E - Murphy Law Firm, #7 Exhibit F - Milberg Law Firm, #8 Exhibit G - The Lyon Firm, #9 Exhibit H - Law Firm of Levin Sedran Berman, #10 Exhibit I - Goldenberg Schneider, LPA, #11 Exhibit J - Law Firm of Wolf Haldenstein)(BAUER, DAVID) Modified on 5/3/2024 to clean up text(jam).
May 1, 2024 Filing 5 ** FILED IN ERROR** Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases 24-cv-146, 24-cv-147, 24-cv-148, 24-cv-149, 24-cv-150, and 24-cv-151 by TONYA GAMBINO Responses due by 5/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Law Firm of SiriGlimstad, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Law Firm of Chestnut Cambronne, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Law Firm of Kopelowitz Ostrow, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D - Law Firm of Daniel Srourian, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E - Murphy Law Firm)(BAUER, DAVID) Modified on 5/2/2024 to indicate filed in error, counsel to refile (jam).
May 1, 2024 Filing 4 **FILED IN ERROR** Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases 24-cv-146, 24-cv-147, 24-cv-148, 24-cv-149, 24-cv-150, and 24-cv-151 by TONYA GAMBINO Responses due by 5/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Law Firm of SiriGlimstad, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Law Firm of Chestnut Cambronne, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Law Firm of Kopelowitz Ostrow, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D - Law Firm of Daniel Srourian, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E - Murphy Law Firm)(BAUER, DAVID) Modified on 5/2/2024 to indicate filed in error, counsel to refile (jam).
May 1, 2024 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMEDC-2947758.), filed by TONYA GAMBINO.(BAUER, DAVID)
April 30, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (cjd)
April 30, 2024 Set Deadlines : Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Disclosure Statement due by 5/7/2024. (cjd)
April 29, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cjd)
April 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by TONYA GAMBINO. (Service of Process Deadline 7/29/2024) Fee due by 5/1/2024.(cjd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GAMBINO v. BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONYA GAMBINO
Represented By: DAVID EDWARD BAUER
Represented By: MASON A. BARNEY
Represented By: TYLER J. BEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MYERSON
Represented By: BRYAN L. BLEICHNER
Represented By: DAVID EDWARD BAUER
Represented By: PHILIP J. KRZESKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA RUSSELL
Represented By: JEFF OSTROW
Represented By: MARIYA WEEKES
Represented By: DAVID EDWARD BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY DAVIS
Represented By: JOSEPH M. LYON
Represented By: KEVIN M. COX
Represented By: DAVID EDWARD BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT HICKMAN
Represented By: DANIEL SROURIAN
Represented By: DAVID EDWARD BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA DEMEL-DUFF
Represented By: AMANDA BROOKE MURPHY
Represented By: DAVID EDWARD BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELODY BOWMAN
Represented By: BRETT R. COHEN
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: DAVID EDWARD BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY BISHOP
Represented By: DAVID EDWARD BAUER
Represented By: JEFFREY S. GOLDENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL EDWARDS
Represented By: CARL MALMSTROM
Represented By: DAVID EDWARD BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YASMIN ENCARNACION
Represented By: ALEXANDER E. SPADINGER
Represented By: JAMES J. PIZZIRUSSO
Represented By: STEVEN M. NATHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMILY COULTER
Represented By: MATTHEW FORNARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUINTON ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDY BISHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTIE IUSHKOVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALLY HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD DEE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDY BRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYRON NOTTINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MEYERSON
Represented By: PHILIP J. KRZESKI
Represented By: BRYAN L. BLEICHNER
Represented By: DAVID EDWARD BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YASMINE ENCARNACION
Represented By: ALEXANDER E. SPADINGER
Represented By: JAMES J. PIZZIRUSSO
Represented By: STEVEN M. NATHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER WALDEN LEE
Represented By: DAVID ROSS
Represented By: SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZZ ENTERPRISES LLC doing business as RELIABLE NETWORKS OF MAINE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RELIABLE NETWORKS OF MAINE LLC
Represented By: JAY S. GREGORY
Represented By: NANCY KELLY
Represented By: SHAUN D. LOUGHLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?